This case was last updated from Palm Beach County 15th Judicial Circuit Courts on 03/13/2023 at 15:13:13 (UTC).

WESTLAKE SERVICES, LLC, DBA WESTLAKE FINANCIAL SERVICES V LOUIS-AIME, MATALINE

Case Summary

On 02/01/2023 WESTLAKE SERVICES, LLC, DBA WESTLAKE FINANCIAL SERVICES filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against LOUIS-AIME, MATALINE. This case was filed in Palm Beach County 15th Judicial Circuit Courts, North County Courthouse located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is STEPHENS , DEBRA MOSES. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-NB

  • Filing Date:

    02/01/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

STEPHENS , DEBRA MOSES

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

WESTLAKE SERVICES, LLC, DBA WESTLAKE FINANCIAL SERVICES

Defendants and Respondents

LOUIS-AIME , MATALINE

OXEOUS , DJIMY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

PILUIKO , OLEKSANDRA

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

02/01/2023:CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

02/01/2023:COMPLAINT

SUMMONS REQUESTED

02/01/2023:SUMMONS REQUESTED

SUMMONS REQUESTED

02/01/2023:SUMMONS REQUESTED

PAID $320.00 ON RECEIPT 4765209

02/02/2023:PAID $320.00 ON RECEIPT 4765209

SUMMONS ISSUED

02/02/2023:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

02/02/2023:SUMMONS ISSUED

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

02/11/2023:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

02/13/2023:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

MOTION TO ADOPT SETTLEMENT STIPULATION F/B PLT

02/28/2023:MOTION TO ADOPT SETTLEMENT STIPULATION F/B PLT

HEARING BY COURT PRETRIAL

03/07/2023:HEARING BY COURT PRETRIAL

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/07/2023
  • HearingSCPTHA - Small Claims Pretrial Attorney; Location: NB; Room: #1 (North Branch); Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketHEARING BY COURT PRETRIAL; Notes: PLTS ATTY PRESENT & DFT NOT PRESENT - CONT PENDING SETTLEMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO ADOPT SETTLEMENT STIPULATION F/B PLT; Notes: TO ADOPT SETTLEMENT STIPULATION F/B PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes: RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED MATALINE LOUIS-AIME - 02/11/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes: RETURN OF SERVICE SUBSTITUTE DJIMY OXEUS - 02/11/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • FinancialReceipt Number: 4765209; Receipt Amount: $320.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • FinancialTotals:; total Amount Due: $320.00; total Amount Paid: $320.00; total-Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • FinancialDue Date: 02/02/2023; Description: e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • FinancialDue Date: 02/02/2023; Description: e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • FinancialDue Date: 02/02/2023; Description: 400FF County Civil Claim >$2500<= $15000; Amount Due: $300.00; Amount Paid: $300.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: ESERVICE@ANDREUPALMA.COM DJIMY OXEOUS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: ESERVICE@ANDREUPALMA.COM MATALINE LOUIS-AIME

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • DocketSET FOR SCPTHA - SMALL CLAIMS PRETRIAL ATTORNEY 3/7/2023 8:45 AM STEPHENS, DEBRA MOSES; Notes: SCPTHA - Small Claims Pretrial Attorney 3/7/2023 8:45 AM STEPHENS, DEBRA MOSES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $320.00 ON RECEIPT 4765209; Notes: $320.00 4765209 Fully Paid

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes: RH: North Branch Cty Civ, SC, Evictions - RH (Civil)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS REQUESTED; Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS REQUESTED; Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Notes: FOR DAMAGES F/B PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Notes: F/B PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less