Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Palm Beach Court System on 04/25/2021 at 18:41:33 (UTC).

WEST DELRAY COLLISION CENTER LLC (ASSIGNEE OF SELTZER, SAMUEL) V ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 04/15/2021 WEST DELRAY COLLISION CENTER LLC ASSIGNEE OF SELTZER, SAMUEL filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Florida Palm Beach Court System, South County Courthouse located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CORLEW , REGINALD. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-SB

  • Filing Date:

    04/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Florida Palm Beach Court System

  • Courthouse:

    South County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CORLEW , REGINALD

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

WEST DELRAY COLLISION CENTER LLC (ASSIGNEE OF SELTZER, SAMUEL)

Defendant and Respondent

ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

KASPER , CHRIS

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT

04/15/2021:COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ISSUED

04/16/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED

PAID $185.00 ON RECEIPT 3990540

04/16/2021:PAID $185.00 ON RECEIPT 3990540

NOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION

04/15/2021:NOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

04/15/2021:REQUEST TO PRODUCE

NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

04/15/2021:NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

CIVIL COVER SHEET

04/15/2021:CIVIL COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/19/2021
  • HearingSCPTHA - Small Claims Pretrial Attorney; Location:SB; Room:ZOOM DIVISION RD (South Branch)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • FinancialReceipt Number:3990540; Receipt Amount: $185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • FinancialTotals: total Amount Due:$185.00; total Amount Paid:$185.00; total-Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • FinancialDue Date:04/16/2021; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • FinancialDue Date:04/16/2021; Description:406FF County Civil Claim >$500 < $2500; Amount Due:$175.00; Amount Paid:$175.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes:EFILE2@WESETTHESTANDARDS.COM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketSET FOR SCPTHA - SMALL CLAIMS PRETRIAL ATTORNEY 5/19/2021 10:00 AM CORLEW, JUDGEREGINALD; Notes:SCPTHA - Small Claims Pretrial Attorney 5/19/2021 10:00 AM CORLEW, JUDGEREGINALD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $185.00 ON RECEIPT 3990540; Notes:$185.00 3990540 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes:RD: South Branch County Civil Division - RD (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION; Notes:F/B ATTY CHRIS KASPER OBO PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Notes:FIRST F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS; Notes:SERVICE OF FIRST/TO DEFENDANT F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Notes:F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Notes:F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WEST DELRAY COLLISION CENTER LLC (ASSIGNEE OF EPSTEIN, CHERYL) is a litigant

Latest cases where Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KASPER , CHRIS