Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Palm Beach Court System on 02/12/2021 at 19:49:13 (UTC).

WESCO DISTRIBUTION INC V CAPITAL CONSTRUCTION AND DEVELOPMENT INC

Case Summary

On 01/08/2021 WESCO DISTRIBUTION INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against CAPITAL CONSTRUCTION AND DEVELOPMENT INC. This case was filed in Florida Palm Beach Court System, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is SCHOSBERG_FEUER , SAMANTHA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    01/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Florida Palm Beach Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Main Branch

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

SCHOSBERG_FEUER , SAMANTHA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

WESCO DISTRIBUTION INC

Defendants and Respondents

CAPITAL CONSTRUCTION AND DEVELOPMENT INC

FLORENCE , ANTHONY

MCALEES , JOSHUA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

RINGEL ESQ, THOMAS

 

Court Documents

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

02/01/2021:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

01/29/2021:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

01/29/2021:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

PAID $30.00 ON RECEIPT 3875874

01/15/2021:PAID $30.00 ON RECEIPT 3875874

SUMMONS ISSUED

01/13/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

01/13/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

01/13/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED

PAID $401.00 ON RECEIPT 3871902

01/13/2021:PAID $401.00 ON RECEIPT 3871902

COMPLAINT

01/08/2021:COMPLAINT

CIVIL COVER SHEET

01/08/2021:CIVIL COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes:RETURN OF SERVICE SUBSTITUTE JOSHUA MCALEES, - 01/25/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes:RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED ANTHONY FLORENCE - 01/25/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes:RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED CAPITAL CONSTRUCTION AND DEVELOPMENT INC - 01/25/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • FinancialReceipt Number:3875874; Receipt Amount: $30.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • FinancialTotals: total Amount Due:$431.00; total Amount Paid:$431.00; total-Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • FinancialDue Date:01/15/2021; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • FinancialDue Date:01/15/2021; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • FinancialDue Date:01/15/2021; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $30.00 ON RECEIPT 3875874; Notes:$30.00 3875874 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • FinancialReceipt Number:3871902; Receipt Amount: $401.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • FinancialDue Date:01/13/2021; Description:800FF - Circuit Civil General PB; Amount Due:$401.00; Amount Paid:$401.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes:tringel@mrthlaw.com;clima@mrthlaw.com;echassman@mrthlaw.com AS TO DFT JOSHUA MCALEES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes:tringel@mrthlaw.com;clima@mrthlaw.com;echassman@mrthlaw.com AS TO DFT ANTHONY FLORENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes:tringel@mrthlaw.com;clima@mrthlaw.com;echassman@mrthlaw.com AS TO DFT CAPITAL CONSTRUCTION & DEVELOPMENT INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $401.00 ON RECEIPT 3871902; Notes:$401.00 3871902 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes:AH: Circuit Civil Central - AH (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Notes:F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CAPITAL CONSTRUCTION & DEVELOPMENT INC is a litigant

Latest cases where WESCO DISTRIBUTION INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer RINGEL ESQ, THOMAS