This case was last updated from Palm Beach County Courts on 02/27/2022 at 05:16:32 (UTC).

WELLS FARGO CLEARING SERVICES LLC V FINANCIAL INDUSTRY REGULATORY AUTHORITY INC

Case Summary

On 01/07/2022 WELLS FARGO CLEARING SERVICES LLC filed an Other lawsuit against FINANCIAL INDUSTRY REGULATORY AUTHORITY INC. This case was filed in Palm Beach County Courts, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is KEYSER , JANIS. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    01/07/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

KEYSER , JANIS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

WELLS FARGO CLEARING SERVICES LLC

Defendant and Respondent

FINANCIAL INDUSTRY REGULATORY AUTHORITY INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

SPALLINA , RANDI PERRY

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

01/07/2022:CIVIL COVER SHEET

PETITION

01/07/2022:PETITION

SUMMONS ISSUED

01/07/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

PAID $411.00 ON RECEIPT 4306295

01/10/2022:PAID $411.00 ON RECEIPT 4306295

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

01/12/2022:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

FINAL ORDER

01/18/2022:FINAL ORDER

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketDISPOSED BEFORE OTHER; Notes:DBO - DISPOSED BEFORE OTHER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFINAL ORDER; Notes:KEYSER DTD 1/18/22: AND JUDGMENT CONFIRMING ARBITRATION AWARD AND EXPUNGEMENT GRANTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes:RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED FINANCIAL INDUSTRY REGULATORY AUTHORITY, INC - 01/11/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • FinancialReceipt Number:4306295; Receipt Amount: $411.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • FinancialTotals: total Amount Due:$411.00; total Amount Paid:$411.00; total-Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • FinancialDue Date:01/10/2022; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • FinancialDue Date:01/10/2022; Description:800FF - Circuit Civil General PB; Amount Due:$401.00; Amount Paid:$401.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $411.00 ON RECEIPT 4306295; Notes:$411.00 4306295 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes:AB: Circuit Civil Central - AB (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes:rspallina@bressler.com;joliva@bressler.com AS TO FINANCIAL INDUSTRY REGULATORY AUTHORITY INC EFILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITION; Notes:IN THE FORM OF A MOTION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION AWARD AND FOR ENTRY OF FINAL JUDGMENT CONFIRMING ARBITRATION AWARD AND EXPUNGEMENT F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Financial Industry Regulatory Authority, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Wells Fargo Clearing Services, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SPALLINA RANDI PERRY