This case was last updated from Florida Palm Beach Court System on 09/15/2021 at 19:57:00 (UTC).

WELLS FARGO CLEARING SERVICES LLC V FINANCIAL INDUSTRY REGULATORY AUTHORITY INC

Case Summary

On 08/10/2021 WELLS FARGO CLEARING SERVICES LLC filed a Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange lawsuit against FINANCIAL INDUSTRY REGULATORY AUTHORITY INC. This case was filed in Florida Palm Beach Court System, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is GOODMAN , JAIMIE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    08/10/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

GOODMAN , JAIMIE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

WELLS FARGO CLEARING SERVICES LLC

Defendant and Respondent

FINANCIAL INDUSTRY REGULATORY AUTHORITY INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

SIMMS , JOELLE A

 

Court Documents

FINAL ORDER

08/27/2021:FINAL ORDER

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

08/17/2021:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

PAID $411.00 ON RECEIPT 4138031

08/12/2021:PAID $411.00 ON RECEIPT 4138031

SUMMONS ISSUED

08/10/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED

PETITION

08/10/2021:PETITION

CIVIL COVER SHEET

08/10/2021:CIVIL COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/27/2021
  • DocketDISPOSED BY JUDGE; Notes:DJ - DISPOSED BY JUDGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFINAL ORDER; Notes:GOODMAN DTD 8/25/21: AND JUDGMENT CONFIRMING ARBITRATION AWARD AND EXPUNGEMENT GRANTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes:RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED FINANCIAL INDUSTRY REGULATORY AUTHORITY, INC - 08/13/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • FinancialReceipt Number:4138031; Receipt Amount: $411.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • FinancialTotals: total Amount Due:$411.00; total Amount Paid:$411.00; total-Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • FinancialDue Date:08/12/2021; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • FinancialDue Date:08/12/2021; Description:800FF - Circuit Civil General PB; Amount Due:$401.00; Amount Paid:$401.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $411.00 ON RECEIPT 4138031; Notes:$411.00 4138031 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes:AD: Circuit Civil Central - AD (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes:jsimms@bressler.com;ktoulon@bressler.com TO BE SERVED ON FINANCIAL INDUSTRY REGULATORY AUTHORITY INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITION; Notes:IN THE FORM OF A MOTION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION AWARD AND FOR ENTRY OF FINAL JUDGMENT CONFIRMING ARBITRATION AWARD AND EXPUNGEMENT FILED BY WELLS FARGO CLEARING SERVICES LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Financial Industry Regulatory Authority, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Wells Fargo Clearing Services, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SIMMS , JOELLE A