Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Palm Beach Court System on 07/30/2019 at 15:44:49 (UTC).

WELLS FARGO BANK NA V OBEI, ELISEE

Case Summary

On 09/26/2012 WELLS FARGO BANK NA filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against OBEI, ELISEE. This case was filed in Florida Palm Beach Court System, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BLANC , PETER D. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    09/26/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Florida Palm Beach Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Main Branch

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BLANC , PETER D

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

WELLS FARGO BANK NA

Defendants and Respondents

OBEI, ELISEE

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF ELISEE OBEI

ELISEE, VOSE

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF VOSE ELISEE

RAINBERRY WOODS HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC

PINE TRAIL EAST HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC

UNKNOWN TENANT #1

UNKNOWN TENANT #2

UNKNOWN TENANT #3

UNKNOWN TENANT #4

ELISEE , VOSE

OBEI , ELISEE

9 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

SLAMAN ESQ, AMY P

FINDLEY ESQ, SUSAN WENDY

WHITE , ZAKKIYYAH T

DONZA ESQ, DONNA M

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

HAUSERMAN , JOSHUA TODD HILL

ZEDNEK ESQ, GEORGE

 

Court Documents

PAID $834.20 ON RECEIPT 1564715

04/15/2016:PAID $834.20 ON RECEIPT 1564715

FORECLOSURE CERTIFICATE OF SALE

03/14/2016:FORECLOSURE CERTIFICATE OF SALE

PROOF OF PUBLICATION

03/07/2016:PROOF OF PUBLICATION

ORDER RESETTING SALE DATE, RESCHEDULED SALE DATE 03/14/2016, CANCEL 2/8/2016, JKEYSER SIGNED 2/8/2016

02/08/2016:ORDER RESETTING SALE DATE, RESCHEDULED SALE DATE 03/14/2016, CANCEL 2/8/2016, JKEYSER SIGNED 2/8/2016

NOTICE OF HEARING

11/25/2015:NOTICE OF HEARING

NOTICE OF HEARING

10/20/2015:NOTICE OF HEARING

MOTION

08/26/2015:MOTION

RETURNED MAIL

05/20/2015:RETURNED MAIL

CLERK NOTICE NOT CONFIDENTIAL

05/13/2015:CLERK NOTICE NOT CONFIDENTIAL

FINAL DISPOSITION SHEET

05/08/2015:FINAL DISPOSITION SHEET

FINAL JUDGMENT FORECLOSURE BOOK 27527 PAGE 219

05/08/2015:FINAL JUDGMENT FORECLOSURE BOOK 27527 PAGE 219

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

11/07/2012:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

ANSWER

10/18/2012:ANSWER

SUMMONS ISSUED

09/26/2012:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

09/26/2012:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

09/26/2012:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

09/26/2012:SUMMONS ISSUED

COMPLAINT

09/26/2012:COMPLAINT

87 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PAID $834.20 ON RECEIPT 1564715; Notes:$834.20 1564715 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2016
  • REVISED RECEIPT 1564715; Notes:1564715

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PAID $70.00 ON RECEIPT 1562939; Notes:$70.00 1562939 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2016
  • REVISED RECEIPT 1562939; Notes:1562939

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE; Notes:OF DISBURSEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF TITLE; Notes:ISSUED TO WELLS FARGO BANK NA BOOK 28191 PAGE 1456

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PAID $70.00 ON RECEIPT 1507311; Notes:$70.00 1507311 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2016
  • REVISED RECEIPT 1507311; Notes:1507311

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2016
  • FORECLOSURE FEES ADDED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PAID $834.20 ON RECEIPT 1564715; Notes:$834.20 1564715 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
140 More Docket Entries
  • 02/08/2016
  • Due Date:02/08/2016; Description:CA Foreclosure Sale Fee; Amount Due:$70.00; Amount Paid:$70.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2016
  • Due Date:02/03/2016; Description:Circuit Civil Reopen Fee; Amount Due:$50.00; Amount Paid:$50.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2016
  • Due Date:01/08/2016; Description:Civil Conversion Fee PB; Amount Due:$50.00; Amount Paid:$50.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2015
  • Due Date:12/01/2015; Description:Civil Conversion Fee PB; Amount Due:$70.00; Amount Paid:$70.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2015
  • Due Date:12/01/2015; Description:Civil Conversion Fee PB; Amount Due:$50.00; Amount Paid:$50.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2015
  • Due Date:10/23/2015; Description:Civil Conversion Fee PB; Amount Due:$50.00; Amount Paid:$50.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2015
  • Due Date:09/04/2015; Description:Civil Conversion Fee PB; Amount Due:$50.00; Amount Paid:$50.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2012
  • Due Date:09/27/2012; Description:Civil Conversion Fee PB; Amount Due:$92.50; Amount Paid:$92.50; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2012
  • Due Date:09/27/2012; Description:Civil Conversion Fee PB; Amount Due:$906.00; Amount Paid:$906.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2012
  • Due Date:09/27/2012; Description:Civil Conversion Fee PB; Amount Due:$5.60; Amount Paid:$5.60; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HAUSERMAN , JOSHUA TODD HILL