This case was last updated from Palm Beach County Courts on 12/28/2021 at 19:06:28 (UTC).

WELLS FARGO BANK N.A. V NESSA, FAZILATUN

Case Summary

On 11/23/2021 WELLS FARGO BANK N A filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against NESSA, FAZILATUN. This case was filed in Palm Beach County Courts, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BRISTOW , APRIL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    11/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BRISTOW , APRIL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

WELLS FARGO BANK N.A.

Defendant and Respondent

NESSA , FAZILATUN

Riviera Beach, FL 33404

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

JACOBSON , ADAM

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

11/23/2021:CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

11/23/2021:COMPLAINT

SUMMONS REQUESTED

11/23/2021:SUMMONS REQUESTED

NOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION

11/23/2021:NOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION

NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL FILING

11/23/2021:NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL FILING

PAID $310.00 ON RECEIPT 4260460

11/24/2021:PAID $310.00 ON RECEIPT 4260460

SUMMONS ISSUED

11/24/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/05/2022
  • HearingSCPTHA - Small Claims Pretrial Attorney; Location:MB; Room:6L (Main Branch)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • FinancialReceipt Number:4260460; Receipt Amount: $310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • FinancialTotals: total Amount Due:$310.00; total Amount Paid:$310.00; total-Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • FinancialDue Date:11/24/2021; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • FinancialDue Date:11/24/2021; Description:400FF County Civil Claim >$2500<= $15000; Amount Due:$300.00; Amount Paid:$300.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes:ESERVICE1@NADERPOURLAW.COM E ISSUED TO ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketSET FOR SCPTHA - SMALL CLAIMS PRETRIAL ATTORNEY 1/5/2022 2:30 PM BRISTOW, APRIL; Notes:SCPTHA - Small Claims Pretrial Attorney 1/5/2022 2:30 PM BRISTOW, APRIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $310.00 ON RECEIPT 4260460; Notes:$310.00 4260460 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes:RF: County Civil Central - RF (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS REQUESTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer JACOBSON, ADAM