This case was last updated from Florida Palm Beach Court System on 08/19/2019 at 21:06:44 (UTC).

WELLS FARGO BANK NA V MACKIE, GRACE D

Case Summary

On 10/02/2013 WELLS FARGO BANK NA filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against MACKIE, GRACE D. This case was filed in Florida Palm Beach Court System, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    10/02/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Courthouse:

    Main Branch

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

WELLS FARGO BANK NA

Defendants and Respondents

MACKIE, GRACE D

NATIONWIDE BANK

AMERICAN EXPRESS TRAVEL REL SVCS COMPANY INC

BOCA GARDENS HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC

MACKIE , GRACE D

UNKNOWN TENANTS OWNERS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

MARSLAND-PETTIT , KARI

PRITCHARD , EDWARD B

CADAVIECO , KASEY

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

WIHNYK , MAXWELL H

MONTEKIO , MICHELLE

BERNSTEIN , JOHN S

 

Court Documents

PAID $50.00 ON RECEIPT 1720892

06/23/2016:PAID $50.00 ON RECEIPT 1720892

NOTICE OF HEARING

09/26/2014:NOTICE OF HEARING

NOTICE OF HEARING

08/27/2014:NOTICE OF HEARING

BID SHEET

07/22/2014:BID SHEET

CERTIFICATE OF SALE

07/22/2014:CERTIFICATE OF SALE

PROOF OF PUBLICATION

07/09/2014:PROOF OF PUBLICATION

ORDER RESETTING

06/17/2014:ORDER RESETTING

PROPOSED UNSIGNED ORDER

03/15/2014:PROPOSED UNSIGNED ORDER

MOTION FOR DEFAULT

03/15/2014:MOTION FOR DEFAULT

AFFIDAVIT AS TO COSTS

03/13/2014:AFFIDAVIT AS TO COSTS

WITNESS LIST

02/21/2014:WITNESS LIST

ORDER OF DEFAULT

02/05/2014:ORDER OF DEFAULT

NOTICE OF HEARING

01/20/2014:NOTICE OF HEARING

ALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED

12/27/2013:ALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED

AFFIDAVIT

12/02/2013:AFFIDAVIT

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

11/12/2013:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

COMPLAINT

10/02/2013:COMPLAINT

CIVIL COVER SHEET

10/02/2013:CIVIL COVER SHEET

51 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PAID $50.00 ON RECEIPT 1720892; Notes:$50.00 1720892 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2014
  • ADDITIONAL COMMENTS; Notes:CHECK #79715 DATED 12/8/2014 FOR $50 WAS REFUNDED TO KARI MARSLAND-PETTIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2014
  • RECEIPT FOR PAYMENT; Notes:A Payment of -$15.00 was made on receipt CAMB949159.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2014
  • CHECK PRINTED; Notes:A Disbursment of $15.00 on Check Number 60185 to SHARON R BOCK CLERK & COMPTROLLER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2014
  • CHECK PRINTED; Notes:A Disbursment of $92,316.39 on Check Number 60163 to DISB DAVID A KUPPERMAN ATTORNEY TRUST ACCOUNT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • RETURNED MAIL; Notes:GRACE D. MACKIE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2014
  • CHECK PRINTED; Notes:A Disbursment of $8,663.47 on Check Number 59647 to TUCKER & TIGHE PA TRUST ACCOUNT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE; Notes:OF DISBURSEMENTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2014
  • ADDITIONAL COMMENTS; Notes:10/17/14 REQUESTED $92,316.39 PAYABLE TO DAVID A KUPPERMAN ATTY TRUST ACCOUNT 10/17/14 REQUESTED $15.00 CLERK FEE Associated to docket ORD filed on 2014-10-15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER; Notes:DETERMINING PRIORITY OF LIENS AND EAUTHORIZING DISBURSEMENT OF SURPLUS PROCEEDS GRANTED ** SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS ** D LEWIS DTD 10/15/14

    Read MoreRead Less
131 More Docket Entries
  • 07/22/2014
  • Due Date:07/22/2014; Description:Conversion Registry Posted PB; Amount Due:$154,518.30; Amount Paid:$154,518.30; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2014
  • Due Date:06/13/2014; Description:Civil Conversion Fee PB; Amount Due:$50.00; Amount Paid:$50.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2014
  • Due Date:05/20/2014; Description:Civil Conversion Registry Fee; Amount Due:$128.85; Amount Paid:$128.85; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2014
  • Due Date:05/20/2014; Description:Civil Foreclosure Online Sale Fee; Amount Due:$60.00; Amount Paid:$60.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2014
  • Due Date:05/20/2014; Description:Conversion Registry Posted PB; Amount Due:$8,090.00; Amount Paid:$8,090.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2014
  • Due Date:04/04/2014; Description:Civil Conversion Fee PB; Amount Due:$70.00; Amount Paid:$70.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2013
  • Due Date:12/27/2013; Description:Civil Conversion Fee PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2013
  • Due Date:10/02/2013; Description:Civil Conversion Fee PB; Amount Due:$50.00; Amount Paid:$50.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2013
  • Due Date:10/02/2013; Description:Civil Conversion Fee PB; Amount Due:$5.60; Amount Paid:$5.60; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2013
  • Due Date:10/02/2013; Description:Civil Conversion Fee PB; Amount Due:$906.00; Amount Paid:$906.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BOCA GARDENS HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC is a litigant

Latest cases where AMERICAN EXPRESS TRAVEL is a litigant

Latest cases where NATIONWIDE BANK is a litigant

Latest cases where Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. is a litigant