Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Palm Beach Court System on 07/30/2019 at 14:58:05 (UTC).

WELLS FARGO BANK NA V FISHER, STEPHANIE L

Case Summary

On 09/24/2012 WELLS FARGO BANK NA filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against FISHER, STEPHANIE L. This case was filed in Florida Palm Beach Court System, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    09/24/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Florida Palm Beach Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Main Branch

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

WELLS FARGO BANK NA

Defendants and Respondents

FISHER, STEPHANIE L

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF STEPHANIE L FISHER

WELLS FARGO BANK NA SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO SOUTHTRUST BANK

MELROSE PARK PROPERTY OWNERS ASSOCCIATION INC

UNKNOWN TENANT # 1

UNKNOWN TENANT # 2

UNKNOWN TENANT # 3

UNKNOWN TENANT # 4

FISHER , STEPHANIE L

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

MAYLOR , SUZETTE A

GREEN ESQ, KERRY ANNE

FINDLEY ESQ, SUSAN WENDY

GRAY , DEENA PACELLI

WHITMORE , TEPHANIE D

WHITE , ZAKKIYYAH T

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

LIN , SCOTT R

KEEGAN , MARK G

LUCEY ESQ, DAVID C

 

Court Documents

AGREED ORDER

03/23/2015:AGREED ORDER

AFFIDAVIT OF ATTORNEY FEES

12/15/2014:AFFIDAVIT OF ATTORNEY FEES

NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL FILING

11/21/2014:NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL FILING

AFFIDAVIT

11/21/2014:AFFIDAVIT

EXHIBIT LIST

10/22/2014:EXHIBIT LIST

WITNESS LIST

10/22/2014:WITNESS LIST

NOTICE OF NON JURY TRIAL

07/18/2014:NOTICE OF NON JURY TRIAL

NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY

05/19/2014:NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY

MOTION TO WITHDRAW

02/03/2014:MOTION TO WITHDRAW

RETURNED MAIL

12/16/2013:RETURNED MAIL

ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

12/12/2013:ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

AGREED ORDER

12/10/2013:AGREED ORDER

NOTICE OF SERVICE

04/15/2013:NOTICE OF SERVICE

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

10/23/2012:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

10/23/2012:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

10/23/2012:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

10/23/2012:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

SUMMONS ISSUED

09/24/2012:SUMMONS ISSUED

66 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/10/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PAID $70.00 ON RECEIPT CAMB990649; Notes:$70.00 CAMB990649 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2016
  • REVISED RECEIPT CAMB990649; Notes:CAMB990649

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2015
  • RECEIPT FOR PAYMENT; Notes:A Payment of -$70.00 was made on receipt CAMB990649. Filed by PLAINTIFF WELLS FARGO BANK NA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2015
  • FORECLOSURE SALE FEE ADDED; Notes:Filed by PLAINTIFF WELLS FARGO BANK NA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • VACATE FINAL JDGMNT & DISMISS BOOK 27484 PAGE 54; Notes:ORDER VACATING JUDGMENT, CANCELLING APRIL 20, 2015 FORECLOSURE SALE, DISMISSING CASE WITHOUT PREJUDICE, DISCHARGING LIS PENDENS AND RETURNING ORIGINAL LOAN DOCUMENTS GRANTED R OFTEDAL DTD 04/20/15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2015
  • REDISPOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2015
  • RECEIPT FOR PAYMENT; Notes:A Payment of -$50.00 was made on receipt CAMB990237. Filed by PLAINTIFF WELLS FARGO BANK NA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2015
  • CAFF/REOPEN ($50.00); Notes:Filed by PLAINTIFF WELLS FARGO BANK NA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2015
  • REOPEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF HEARING; Notes:APRIL 20,2015 AT 8:45 AM IN ROOM 4A FILED BY PLT Filed by PLAINTIFF WELLS FARGO BANK NA

    Read MoreRead Less
89 More Docket Entries
  • 04/20/2015
  • Receipt Number:CAMB990237; Receipt Amount: $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2012
  • Receipt Number:CAMB715045; Receipt Amount: $5.10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2012
  • Receipt Number:CAMB715044; Receipt Amount: $8.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2012
  • Receipt Number:CAMB715044; Receipt Amount: $966.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2015
  • Totals: total Amount Due:$1,099.10; total Amount Paid:$1,099.10; total-Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2015
  • Due Date:04/22/2015; Description:Civil Conversion Fee PB; Amount Due:$70.00; Amount Paid:$70.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2015
  • Due Date:04/20/2015; Description:Civil Conversion Fee PB; Amount Due:$50.00; Amount Paid:$50.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2012
  • Due Date:09/26/2012; Description:Civil Conversion Fee PB; Amount Due:$67.50; Amount Paid:$67.50; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2012
  • Due Date:09/26/2012; Description:Civil Conversion Fee PB; Amount Due:$5.60; Amount Paid:$5.60; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2012
  • Due Date:09/26/2012; Description:Civil Conversion Fee PB; Amount Due:$906.00; Amount Paid:$906.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LUCEY, DAVID CHRISTOPHER

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KEEGAN, MARK G