Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Palm Beach Court System on 07/30/2019 at 01:37:18 (UTC).

WELLS FARGO BANK NA V FIDELITY LAND TRUST COMPANY LLC

Case Summary

On 09/18/2012 WELLS FARGO BANK NA filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against FIDELITY LAND TRUST COMPANY LLC. This case was filed in Florida Palm Beach Court System, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    09/18/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Florida Palm Beach Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Main Branch

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

WELLS FARGO BANK NA

Defendants and Respondents

FIDELITY LAND TRUST COMPANY LLC

UNKNOWN BENEFICIARIES UNDER TRUST N0 10810

REYNOLDS, MICHAEL

REYNOLDS, HOPE

RAINBERRY PARK HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC

BANK OF AMERICA NA

UNKNOWN TENANTS OWNERS

REYNOLDS , MICHAEL

REYNOLDS , HOPE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

ROEFARO , NICHOLAS J

MARSLAND-PETTIT , KARI

GORE , KRISTIN A

CADAVIECO , KASEY

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

LONG ESQ, S TRACY

BOWERS ESQ, PETER J

MCNAMARA , DEENA RACHELLE

LEVINE , SCOTT JASON

CLARK , JONATHAN

COE , RACHEL M

 

Court Documents

ORDER SETTING NON-JURY TRIAL

05/08/2014:ORDER SETTING NON-JURY TRIAL

AFFIDAVIT

04/01/2014:AFFIDAVIT

ORDER SETTING HEARING

03/31/2014:ORDER SETTING HEARING

OBJECTION

12/27/2013:OBJECTION

RESPONSE TO:

12/17/2013:RESPONSE TO:

OBJECTION

12/17/2013:OBJECTION

MOTION

10/22/2013:MOTION

NOTICE OF DEFAULT NOT ENTERED

02/28/2013:NOTICE OF DEFAULT NOT ENTERED

REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

02/04/2013:REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

01/18/2013:ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

AFFIDAVIT

01/17/2013:AFFIDAVIT

MOTION FOR DEFAULT

01/17/2013:MOTION FOR DEFAULT

MOTION FOR DEFAULT

01/16/2013:MOTION FOR DEFAULT

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

11/30/2012:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

ORDER

11/29/2012:ORDER

NOTICE OF ACTION - PUBLICATION

11/06/2012:NOTICE OF ACTION - PUBLICATION

SUMMONS ISSUED

09/18/2012:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

09/18/2012:SUMMONS ISSUED

88 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/09/2017
  • CHECK ISSUED; Notes:Deposit (Led_ID: 560640 Case#: F.S. 116.21 JULY ADVERTISEMENT) Check #: 00005629 for $100 was disbursed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2017
  • DISBURSEMENT REQUEST; Notes:2019651 $100.00 SHARON R BOCK CLERK & COMPTROLLER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER; Notes:DIRECTING CLERK OF COURT TO RELEASE ORIGINAL DOCUMENTS FROM THE COURT FILE GRANTED CLERK TO MAIL ORIGINAL DOCS R OFTEDAL DTD 03/16/15 *LETTER DOCS NEVER FILED MAILED TO KASS SHULER ON 3/24/15*SL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2015
  • REDISPOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF HEARING; Notes:3/16/15 @ 8:45AM CTRM 4A F/B PLT Filed by PLAINTIFF WELLS FARGO BANK NA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF HEARING; Notes:MOTION TO WITHDRAW ORIGINAL DOCUMENT FROM THE COURT FILE 10/06/14 AT 8:45AM FB KARI MARSLAND-PETTIT Filed by ATTORNEY KARI MARSLAND-PETTIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2014
  • REOPEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION; Notes:MOTION TO WITHDRAW ORIGINAL DOCUMENTS FROM THE COURT FILE FILED BY PLT Filed by PLAINTIFF WELLS FARGO BANK NA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2014
  • RECEIPT FOR PAYMENT; Notes:A Payment of -$50.00 was made on receipt CAMB926989.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2014
  • CAFF/REOPEN ($50.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
111 More Docket Entries
  • 10/30/2012
  • Receipt Number:CAMB725305; Receipt Amount: $108.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2012
  • Receipt Number:CAMB713965; Receipt Amount: $967.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2012
  • Receipt Number:CAMB713965; Receipt Amount: $9.60

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2017
  • Totals: total Amount Due:$1,235.10; total Amount Paid:$1,235.10; total-Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2017
  • Due Date:01/30/2017; Description:Civil Bond Disbursement; Amount Due:$100.00; Amount Paid:$100.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2014
  • Due Date:08/21/2014; Description:Civil Conversion Fee PB; Amount Due:$50.00; Amount Paid:$50.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2012
  • Due Date:10/30/2012; Description:Conversion Registry Posted PB; Amount Due:$108.50; Amount Paid:$108.50; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2012
  • Due Date:09/24/2012; Description:Civil Conversion Fee PB; Amount Due:$65.00; Amount Paid:$65.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2012
  • Due Date:09/24/2012; Description:Civil Conversion Fee PB; Amount Due:$5.60; Amount Paid:$5.60; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2012
  • Due Date:09/24/2012; Description:Civil Conversion Fee PB; Amount Due:$906.00; Amount Paid:$906.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases where Bank of America is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Coe, Rachel M, ESQ.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MCNAMARA , DEENA RACHELLE