This case was last updated from Palm Beach County Courts on 08/01/2022 at 22:58:55 (UTC).

WELLS FARGO BANK NA V DONATH, SUSAN

Case Summary

On 06/22/2022 WELLS FARGO BANK NA filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against DONATH, SUSAN. This case was filed in Palm Beach County Courts, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CHEESMAN , MAXINE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    06/22/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CHEESMAN , MAXINE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

WELLS FARGO BANK NA

Defendants and Respondents

BRIDGEVIEW ASSOCIATION INC

DONATH , SUSAN

UNKNOWN PARTY #1

UNKNOWN PARTY #2

UNKNOWN PARTY #3

UNKNOWN PARTY #4

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

DILTS , DAVID

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

MARRA , PAULA S

 

Court Documents

LIS PENDENS

06/22/2022:LIS PENDENS

NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT/REPORT

07/25/2022:NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT/REPORT

NOTICE OF FILING

07/25/2022:NOTICE OF FILING

NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY

07/25/2022:NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY

REPLY/RESPONSE

07/19/2022:REPLY/RESPONSE

SERVICE RETURN- NOT SERVED

07/18/2022:SERVICE RETURN- NOT SERVED

SERVICE RETURN- NOT SERVED

07/18/2022:SERVICE RETURN- NOT SERVED

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

07/18/2022:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

07/18/2022:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

ANSWER

07/14/2022:ANSWER

PAID $954.10 ON RECEIPT 4514132

06/26/2022:PAID $954.10 ON RECEIPT 4514132

SUMMONS ISSUED

06/22/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

06/22/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

06/22/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

06/22/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

06/22/2022:STATEMENT OF CLAIM

COMPLAINT

06/22/2022:COMPLAINT

CIVIL COVER SHEET

06/22/2022:CIVIL COVER SHEET

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT/REPORT; Notes: AFFIDAVIT AS TO NON-MILITARY SERVICE SUSAN DONATH NKA SUSAN CONSIGLI; JOHN J. CONSIGLI, DECEASED; MARIE CONSIGLI, DECEASED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING; Notes: NOTICE OF FILING OF AFFIDAVIT AS TO NON-MILITARY SERVICE PLAINTIFF, WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A., GIVES NOTICE OF FILING OF AFFIDAVIT AS TO NON-MILITARY SERVICE. CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY; Notes: AS TO DFTS UKNOWN PARTY #1, UNKNOWN PARTY #2, UNKNOWN PARTY #3, AND UNKNOWN PARTY #4 F/B PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREPLY/RESPONSE; Notes: F/B DFT SUSAN DONATH PRO SE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURN- NOT SERVED; Notes: RETURN OF SERVICE UNKNOWN PARTY #1 UNKNOWN PARTY #1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURN- NOT SERVED; Notes: RETURN OF SERVICE UNKNOWN PARTY #2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes: RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED BRIDGEVIEW ASSOCIATION, INC - 07/13/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes: RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED SUSAN DONATH N/K/A SUSAN CONSIGLI - 07/01/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER; Notes: TO COMPLAINT F/B DFT BRIDGEVIEW ASSOCIATION INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2022
  • FinancialReceipt Number: 4514132; Receipt Amount: $954.10

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 06/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $954.10 ON RECEIPT 4514132; Notes: $954.10 4514132 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2022
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes: AJ: Circuit Civil Central - AJ (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: ecf@albertellilaw.com AS TO DFT UNKNOWN PARTY #2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: ecf@albertellilaw.com AS TO DFT UNKNOWN PARTY #1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: ecf@albertellilaw.com AS TO DFT SUSAN DONATH NKA SUSAN CONSIGLI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: ecf@albertellilaw.com AS TO DFT BRIDGEVIEW ASSOCIATION INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Notes: F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLIS PENDENS BOOK 33666 PAGE 1752-1752; Notes: F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Notes: VERIFIED COMPLAINT TO FORECLOSE MORTGAGE. F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Notes: F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BRIDGEVIEW ASSOCIATION INC is a litigant

Latest cases where Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer David Michael Dilts