This case was last updated from Florida Palm Beach Court System on 08/20/2019 at 23:11:21 (UTC).

WELLS FARGO BANK NA V DEISER, ALEXANDER

Case Summary

On 11/02/2018 WELLS FARGO BANK NA filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against DEISER, ALEXANDER. This case was filed in Florida Palm Beach Court System, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MARTZ , JAMES L. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    11/02/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Florida Palm Beach Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Main Branch

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MARTZ , JAMES L

 

Party Details

Plaintiff, Defendant, Petitioner and Respondent

WELLS FARGO BANK NA

Defendants, Respondents and Petitioners

SATURNIA BY THE SEA PROPERTY OWNERS ASSOCIATION INC

WELLS FARGO BANK NA

NETTIG , CLAUDIA K

THE UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF HELEN FISCHER

CAPITAL ONE BANK USA NATIONAL ASSOCIATION

THE UNKNOWN BENEFICIARIES OF THE CARL FISCHER TRUST DATED

DEISER , ALEXANDER

UNKNOWN TENANT

FISCHER , HELEN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant, Respondent, Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

GRIFFITHS , HEATHER L

ANTHOUSIS , JULIE

GONZALEZ , ALEKSANDRA NOVAKOVICH

FLEYSHER , EMIL

 

Court Documents

WITNESS LIST

08/08/2019:WITNESS LIST

NOTICE OF NON JURY TRIAL

07/29/2019:NOTICE OF NON JURY TRIAL

ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

06/12/2019:ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

05/16/2019:REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

05/15/2019:NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

NOTICE OF HEARING

03/19/2019:NOTICE OF HEARING

NOTICE OF HEARING

03/13/2019:NOTICE OF HEARING

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL

02/15/2019:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

02/06/2019:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

02/06/2019:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

NOTICE OF HEARING

01/28/2019:NOTICE OF HEARING

SERVICE RETURN- NOT SERVED

01/23/2019:SERVICE RETURN- NOT SERVED

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

01/23/2019:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

SERVICE RETURN- NOT SERVED

01/23/2019:SERVICE RETURN- NOT SERVED

SERVICE RETURN- NOT SERVED

01/23/2019:SERVICE RETURN- NOT SERVED

SERVICE RETURN- NOT SERVED

01/23/2019:SERVICE RETURN- NOT SERVED

SUMMONS ISSUED

11/02/2018:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

11/02/2018:SUMMONS ISSUED

71 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • WITNESS LIST; Notes:PLAINTIFF'S WITNESS LIST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • WITNESS LIST; Notes:PLAINTIFF'S WITNESS LIST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • EVIDENCE/EXHIBIT LIST FILED; Notes:PLAINTIFF'S EXHIBIT LIST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE; Notes:CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF ORDER SETTING NON JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER SETTING NON-JURY TRIAL; Notes:R COLTON: RESIDENTIAL FORECLOSURE AND DIRECTING PRETRIAL PROCEDURES: YOU WILL APPEAR AT 9:00 AM ON 9-11-19 RM 4A. DTD 8-1-19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF NON JURY TRIAL; Notes:F/B PLT - UP 7/31/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; Notes:FILED BY GEORGE KURSCHNER - ATTORNEY AD LITEM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • REPORT; Notes:TO COURT FILED BY GEORGE KURSCHNER - ATTORNEY AD LITEM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO INTERROGATORIES; Notes:NOTICE OF SERVING PLAINTIFF'S ANSWERS TO DEFENDANT'S INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; Notes:F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
78 More Docket Entries
  • 11/07/2018
  • Due Date:11/07/2018; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2018
  • Due Date:11/07/2018; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2018
  • Due Date:11/07/2018; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2018
  • Due Date:11/07/2018; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2018
  • Due Date:11/07/2018; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2018
  • Due Date:11/07/2018; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2018
  • Due Date:11/07/2018; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2018
  • Due Date:11/07/2018; Description:Lis Pendens 1st Page $5.60; Amount Due:$5.60; Amount Paid:$5.60; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2018
  • Due Date:11/07/2018; Description:8XDT Additional DFT over 5 $2.50; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2018
  • Due Date:11/07/2018; Description:800F3 CircCivil Real Prop$250,000 or more PB; Amount Due:$1,906.00; Amount Paid:$1,906.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less