Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Palm Beach Court System on 07/30/2019 at 01:35:53 (UTC).

WELLS FARGO BANK NA V CAPONE, RICHARD

Case Summary

On 09/18/2012 WELLS FARGO BANK NA filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against CAPONE, RICHARD. This case was filed in Florida Palm Beach Court System, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    09/18/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Florida Palm Beach Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Main Branch

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

WELLS FARGO BANK NA

Defendants and Respondents

CAPONE, RICHARD

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF RICHARD CAPONE

AMTRUST BANK A DIVISION OF OHIO SAVINGS BANK

BRENTWOOD ESTATES HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC

BRENTWOOD MAINTENANCE ASSOCIATION INC

UNKNOWN TENANT # 1

UNKNOWN TENANT # 2

UNKNOWN TENANT # 3

UNKNOWN TENANT # 4

CAPONE , RICHARD

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

MAYLOR , SUZETTE A

BARBACCIA ESQ, SARAH M

JOO KANG , YEONG (SUSAN)

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

STEVENS , KIM F

KLEIN , ERIC N

CHARLSE ESQ, SHERI STEIN

 

Court Documents

FINAL DISPOSITION SHEET

06/30/2014:FINAL DISPOSITION SHEET

VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL BOOK 26921 PAGE 1680

06/27/2014:VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL BOOK 26921 PAGE 1680

NOTICE OF HEARING

06/20/2014:NOTICE OF HEARING

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

10/10/2013:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

DEFAULT

09/30/2013:DEFAULT

NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY

09/27/2013:NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

11/05/2012:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

11/05/2012:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

11/05/2012:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

11/05/2012:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

MOTION TO DISMISS

10/22/2012:MOTION TO DISMISS

ANSWER

10/16/2012:ANSWER

SUMMONS ISSUED

09/18/2012:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

09/18/2012:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

09/18/2012:SUMMONS ISSUED

NOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION

09/18/2012:NOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION

CIVIL COVER SHEET

09/18/2012:CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

09/18/2012:COMPLAINT

20 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/30/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • FINAL DISPOSITION SHEET; Notes:FILED BY JUIDGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER OF DISMISSAL BOOK 26891 PAGE 1962; Notes:ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION: GRANTED: & THE CASE IS CLOSED: R OFTEDAL DTD 6/30/14

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2014
  • REDISPOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2014
  • REOPEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2014
  • RECEIPT FOR PAYMENT; Notes:A Payment of -$19.10 was made on receipt CAMB911460. Filed by PLAINTIFF WELLS FARGO BANK NA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • FINAL DISPOSITION SHEET; Notes:F/B ATTY Filed By ATTORNEY SARAH M BARBACCIA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL BOOK 26921 PAGE 1680; Notes:WITHOUT PREJUDICE AND DISCHARGE OF LIS PENDENS F/B PLT Filed by PLAINTIFF WELLS FARGO BANK NA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2014
  • DISPOSED BEFORE OTHER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF HEARING; Notes:NOTICE OF HEARING ON JUNE 30, 2014 AT 8:45 AM ON MOTION TO DISMISS WITH PREJUDICE AND RELEASE OF LIS PENDENS Filed by ATTORNEY ERIC N KLEIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION TO DISMISS; Notes:MOTION TO DISMISS WITH PREJUDICE AND RELEASE OF LIS PENDENS FILED BY DFT CAPONE Filed by DEFENDANT RICHARD CAPONE

    Read MoreRead Less
32 More Docket Entries
  • 09/18/2012
  • ADDITIONAL COMMENTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2014
  • Receipt Number:CAMB911460; Receipt Amount: $19.10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2012
  • Receipt Number:CAMB714195; Receipt Amount: $7.10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2012
  • Receipt Number:CAMB714191; Receipt Amount: $1,978.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2012
  • Receipt Number:CAMB714191; Receipt Amount: $6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2014
  • Totals: total Amount Due:$2,010.70; total Amount Paid:$2,010.70; total-Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2014
  • Due Date:06/30/2014; Description:Civil Conversion Fee PB; Amount Due:$19.10; Amount Paid:$19.10; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2012
  • Due Date:09/24/2012; Description:Civil Conversion Fee PB; Amount Due:$80.00; Amount Paid:$80.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2012
  • Due Date:09/24/2012; Description:Civil Conversion Fee PB; Amount Due:$5.60; Amount Paid:$5.60; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2012
  • Due Date:09/24/2012; Description:Civil Conversion Fee PB; Amount Due:$1,906.00; Amount Paid:$1,906.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AMTRUST BANK is a litigant

Latest cases where Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kim F Stevens (esq)