This case was last updated from Palm Beach County 15th Judicial Circuit Courts on 01/29/2023 at 17:00:15 (UTC).

WELLS FARGO BANK N.A. V AHMED, MARUF

Case Summary

On 01/09/2023 WELLS FARGO BANK N A filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against AHMED, MARUF. This case was filed in Palm Beach County 15th Judicial Circuit Courts, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is SHULLMAN , SARAH L. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    01/09/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

SHULLMAN , SARAH L

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

WELLS FARGO BANK N.A.

Defendant and Respondent

AHMED , MARUF

Greenacres, FL 33413-2125

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

JAMSHED , SABERIN J

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

01/09/2023:CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

01/09/2023:COMPLAINT

SUMMONS REQUESTED

01/09/2023:SUMMONS REQUESTED

NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL FILING

01/09/2023:NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL FILING

NOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION

01/09/2023:NOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION

PAID $310.00 ON RECEIPT 4737982

01/10/2023:PAID $310.00 ON RECEIPT 4737982

SUMMONS ISSUED

01/10/2023:SUMMONS ISSUED

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

01/26/2023:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/02/2023
  • HearingSCPTHA - Small Claims Pretrial Attorney; Location: MB; Room: 6M (Main Branch); Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes: RETURN OF SERVICE SUBSTITUTE MARUF AHMED - 01/25/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • FinancialReceipt Number: 4737982; Receipt Amount: $310.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • FinancialTotals:; total Amount Due: $310.00; total Amount Paid: $310.00; total-Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • FinancialDue Date: 01/10/2023; Description: e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • FinancialDue Date: 01/10/2023; Description: 400FF County Civil Claim >$2500<= $15000; Amount Due: $300.00; Amount Paid: $300.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: ESERVICE1@NADERPOURLAW.COM;ESERVICE2@NADERPOURLAW.COM E ISSUED TO ATTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • DocketSET FOR SCPTHA - SMALL CLAIMS PRETRIAL ATTORNEY 2/2/2023 10:00 AM SHULLMAN, SARAH L; Notes: SCPTHA - Small Claims Pretrial Attorney 2/2/2023 10:00 AM SHULLMAN, SARAH L

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $310.00 ON RECEIPT 4737982; Notes: $310.00 4737982 Fully Paid

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes: RE: County Civil Central - RE (Civil)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION; Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL FILING; Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS REQUESTED; Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less