This case was last updated from Florida Palm Beach Court System on 07/12/2019 at 21:53:01 (UTC).

WELLS FARGO BANK NA AS TRUSTEE ON BEHALF OF THE HOLDERS OF THE HARBORVIEW MORTGAGE LOAN TRUST MORTGAGE LOAN PASS THROUGH CERTIFICATES SERIES 2006 12 V ELAD MORTGAGE GROUP LLC

Case Summary

On 06/06/2019 WELLS FARGO BANK NA AS TRUSTEE ON BEHALF OF THE HOLDERS OF THE HARBORVIEW MORTGAGE LOAN TRUST MORTGAGE LOAN PASS THROUGH CERTIFICATES SERIES 2006 12 filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against ELAD MORTGAGE GROUP LLC. This case was filed in Florida Palm Beach Court System, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is KEYSER , JANIS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    06/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Florida Palm Beach Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Main Branch

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

KEYSER , JANIS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

WELLS FARGO BANK NA AS TRUSTEE ON BEHALF OF THE HOLDERS OF THE HARBORVIEW MORTGAGE LOAN TRUST MORTGAGE LOAN PASS THROUGH CERTIFICATES SERIES 2006 12

Defendants and Respondents

ELAD MORTGAGE GROUP LLC

UNKNOWN PARTY IN POSSESSION 4

RIO POCO HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC

UNKNOWN PARTY IN POSSESSION 3

UNKNOWN PARTY IN POSSESSION 2

BLACKMAN ESQ , LAURA S

KENDRICK , CHRISTINA

UNKNOWN PARTY IN POSSESSION 1

NEGRI , VICKI

NEGRI , SHLOMI

AMERICAN EXPRESS CENTURION BANK

UNITED STATES OF AMERICAN DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY

PALM BEACH COUNTY

14 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

CORTES , GABRIELA

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

FREEMAN ESQ, ANYA

SCOTT , CATHLEEN

SUTTON , DESTINIE B

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL

07/08/2019:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL

ANSWER

07/05/2019:ANSWER

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

07/03/2019:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

07/03/2019:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

07/03/2019:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

07/03/2019:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL

06/28/2019:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL

SUMMONS ISSUED

06/10/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED

PAID $139.60 ON RECEIPT 3199976

06/07/2019:PAID $139.60 ON RECEIPT 3199976

SUMMONS ISSUED

06/07/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

06/07/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

06/07/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

06/07/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

06/07/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

06/07/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED

PAID $1,926.00 ON RECEIPT 3198286

06/06/2019:PAID $1,926.00 ON RECEIPT 3198286

COMPLAINT

06/06/2019:COMPLAINT

CIVIL COVER SHEET

06/06/2019:CIVIL COVER SHEET

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME; Notes:TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT F/B DFT ELAD MORTGAGE GROUP LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL; Notes:F/B A FREEMAN OBO ELAD MORTGAGE GROUP LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER; Notes:TO PLAINTIFFS VERIFIED COMPLAINT TO FORECLOSE MORTGAGE FILED BY CHRISTINA KENDRICK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER; Notes:TO COMPLAINT F/B DFT PALM BEACH COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes:RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED UNITED STATES OF AMERICA DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY - 6/13/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes:RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED PALM BEACH COUNTY - 6/13/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes:RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED ELAD MORTGAGE GROUP, LLC - 06/14/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes:AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE SERVED CHRISTINA KENDRICK - 6/18/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes:AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE SERVED AMERICAN EXPRESS CENTURION BANK - 6/19/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL; Notes:AS COUNSEL FOR CHRISTINA KENDRICK AND NOTICE OF INTERESTED PARTIES FILED BY ATTY SCOTT

    Read MoreRead Less
33 More Docket Entries
  • 06/07/2019
  • Due Date:06/07/2019; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • Due Date:06/07/2019; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • Due Date:06/07/2019; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • Due Date:06/07/2019; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • Due Date:06/07/2019; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • Due Date:06/07/2019; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • Due Date:06/07/2019; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • Due Date:06/07/2019; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • Due Date:06/06/2019; Description:8XDT Additional DFT over 5 $2.50; Amount Due:$20.00; Amount Paid:$20.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • Due Date:06/06/2019; Description:800F3 CircCivil Real Prop$250,000 or more PB; Amount Due:$1,906.00; Amount Paid:$1,906.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less