This case was last updated from Palm Beach County 15th Judicial Circuit Courts on 03/12/2023 at 19:05:21 (UTC).

WEINREB, JOSEPH V LEVITAS, MARGITA

Case Summary

On 01/31/2023 WEINREB, JOSEPH filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against LEVITAS, MARGITA. This case was filed in Palm Beach County 15th Judicial Circuit Courts, South County Courthouse located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is SILVER , ORI. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-SB

  • Filing Date:

    01/31/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

SILVER , ORI

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

WEINREB , JOSEPH

Defendant and Respondent

LEVITAS , MARGITA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

KELLEY , JERRON

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

01/31/2023:CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT FOR TENANT EVICTION

01/31/2023:COMPLAINT FOR TENANT EVICTION

SUMMONS ISSUED

01/31/2023:SUMMONS ISSUED

PAID $195.00 ON RECEIPT 4762858

02/01/2023:PAID $195.00 ON RECEIPT 4762858

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

02/02/2023:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

02/08/2023:CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT/REPORT

02/09/2023:NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT/REPORT

MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT

02/09/2023:MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT

MOTION FOR DEFAULT

02/09/2023:MOTION FOR DEFAULT

CLERK'S DEFAULT

02/13/2023:CLERK'S DEFAULT

FINAL JUDGMENT BOOK 34140 PAGE 1514-1514

02/21/2023:FINAL JUDGMENT BOOK 34140 PAGE 1514-1514

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/21/2023
  • DocketDISPOSED BY DEFAULT; Notes: DD - DISPOSED BY DEFAULT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFINAL JUDGMENT BOOK 34140 PAGE 1514-1514; Notes: FOR POSSESSION, AND ORDER DIRECTING THE CLERK OF COURT TO CLOSE THE FILE - SIGNED JUDGE SILVER 2/17/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S DEFAULT; Notes: ESERVICE@KELLEYGRANTLAW.COM TO MARGITA LEVITAS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT; Notes: BY CLERK F/B PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT; Notes: FOR EVICTION F/B PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT/REPORT; Notes: IN RE MARGITA LEVITAS F/B PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MAILING; Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes: RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED MARGITA LEVITAS - 02/01/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • FinancialReceipt Number: 4762858; Receipt Amount: $195.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • FinancialTotals:; total Amount Due: $195.00; total Amount Paid: $195.00; total-Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • FinancialDue Date: 02/01/2023; Description: e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • FinancialDue Date: 02/01/2023; Description: 401FF County Civil Tenant Eviction; Amount Due: $185.00; Amount Paid: $185.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $195.00 ON RECEIPT 4762858; Notes: $195.00 4762858 Fully Paid

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes: RS: South Branch County Civil Division - RS (Civil)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: eservice@kelleygrantlaw.com

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR TENANT EVICTION; Notes: F/B PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Notes: F/B PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less