This case was last updated from Florida Palm Beach Court System on 01/16/2019 at 17:32:14 (UTC).

WEEKS, PATRICIA M

Case Summary

On 12/12/2018 WEEKS, PATRICIA M was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Florida Palm Beach Court System, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is TICKTIN , JESSICA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-SB

  • Filing Date:

    12/12/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Florida Palm Beach Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Main Branch

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

TICKTIN , JESSICA

 

Party Details

Petitioner

WEEKS , SUSAN P

Decedent

WEEKS , PATRICIA M

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

KERN , KEITH D

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/09/2019
  • INVENTORY - ESTATE; Notes:INVENTORY OF SAFE DEPOSIT BOX F/B SUSAN P WEEKS, PETITIONER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • ORDER TO OPEN SAFE DEPOSIT BOX NO CONTENTS SHALL BE REMOVED S/B JDG J. TICKTIN DTD 01/08/19; Notes:TO OPEN SAFE DEPOSIT BOX NO CONTENTS SHALL BE REMOVED S/B JDG J. TICKTIN DTD 01/08/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • DEATH CERTIFICATE; Notes:OF KEVIN SCOTT WEEKS F/B PETR ORIGINAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • DEATH CERT PROBATE DECEDENT; Notes:F/B PETR ORIGINAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • PAID $3.00 ON RECEIPT 2986084; Notes:$3.00 2986084 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2018
  • NOTICE OF TRUST; Notes:F/B SUSAN P WEEKS, TRUSTEE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2018
  • PAID FUNERAL BILL; Notes:F/B ATTY KERN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2018
  • MOTION TO OPEN SAFE DEPOSIT BOX F/B ATTY KERN OBO PETITIONER; Notes:TO OPEN SAFE DEPOSIT BOX F/B ATTY KERN OBO PETITIONER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2018
  • DEATH CERTIFICATE; Notes:FOR KEVIN SCOTT WEEKS COPY-EFILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2018
  • WAIVER AND CONSENT; Notes:RECEIPT F/B KAREN E MARSH

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 12/14/2018
  • DIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes:IZ: South Branch Probate - IZ (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2018
  • WILL; Notes:ORIGINAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2018
  • WILL; Notes:F/B ATTY KERN OBO SUSAN P. WEEKS E-FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2018
  • DEATH CERT PROBATE DECEDENT; Notes:F/B ATTY KERN OBO SUSAN P. WEEKS E-FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2018
  • PETITION FOR SUMMARY ADMIN; Notes:F/B ATTY KERN OBO SUSAN P. WEEKS E-FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • Receipt Number:2986084; Receipt Amount: $3.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2018
  • Receipt Number:2960102; Receipt Amount: $346.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • Totals: total Amount Due:$349.00; total Amount Paid:$349.00; total-Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • Due Date:01/08/2019; Description:CP Probate Service Charges PB; Amount Due:$3.00; Amount Paid:$3.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2018
  • Due Date:12/14/2018; Description:502FF Summary Administration $1000 or more; Amount Due:$346.00; Amount Paid:$346.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less