This case was last updated from Florida Palm Beach Court System on 08/10/2021 at 19:46:47 (UTC).

WEBER, PHYLLIS V ACAR LEASING LTD INC

Case Summary

On 07/06/2021 WEBER, PHYLLIS filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against ACAR LEASING LTD INC. This case was filed in Florida Palm Beach Court System, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is GILLMAN , PAIGE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    07/06/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

GILLMAN , PAIGE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

WEBER , PHYLLIS

Defendants and Respondents

ACAR LEASING LTD INC

MORGAN , MICHAEL A

 

Court Documents

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

07/27/2021:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

07/22/2021:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

07/19/2021:NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

PAID $421.00 ON RECEIPT 4096497

07/08/2021:PAID $421.00 ON RECEIPT 4096497

NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

07/06/2021:NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

07/06/2021:NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

07/06/2021:REQUEST TO PRODUCE

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

07/06/2021:REQUEST TO PRODUCE

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

07/06/2021:REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

07/06/2021:REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

COMPLAINT

07/06/2021:COMPLAINT

DIFFERENTIATED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN STANDING ORDER

07/06/2021:DIFFERENTIATED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN STANDING ORDER

SUMMONS ISSUED

07/06/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

07/06/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED

CIVIL COVER SHEET

07/06/2021:CIVIL COVER SHEET

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes:RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED MICHAEL ALEXANDER MORGAN - 07/21/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes:RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED ACAR LEASING, LTD, INC - 07/12/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Notes:OF DFT ACAR LEASING ONLY (F/B PLT)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • FinancialReceipt Number:4096497; Receipt Amount: $421.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • FinancialTotals: total Amount Due:$421.00; total Amount Paid:$421.00; total-Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • FinancialDue Date:07/08/2021; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • FinancialDue Date:07/08/2021; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • FinancialDue Date:07/08/2021; Description:800FF - Circuit Civil General PB; Amount Due:$401.00; Amount Paid:$401.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $421.00 ON RECEIPT 4096497; Notes:$421.00 4096497 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes:AK: Circuit Civil Central - AK (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS; Notes:GENERAL INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT ACAR LEASING LTD. INC. F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Notes:TO DEFENDANT ACAR LEASING LTD. INC. F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Notes:TO DEFENDANT MICHAEL ALEXANDER MORGAN F/BPLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Notes:TO DEFENDANT MICHAEL ALEXANDER MORGAN F/BPLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Notes:TO DEFENDANT ACAR LEASING LTD. INC. F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Notes:F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDIFFERENTIATED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN STANDING ORDER; Notes:F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes:pleadings@personalinjuryfirm.com;melissa@personalinjuryfirm.com;noel@personalinjuryfirm.com ISSUED TO ACAR LEASING LTD INC EFILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes:pleadings@personalinjuryfirm.com;melissa@personalinjuryfirm.com;noel@personalinjuryfirm.com ISSUED TO MICHAEL ALEXANDER MORGAN EFILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ACAR LEASING LTD. AKA GM FINANCIAL LEASING LIMITED is a litigant