*********************X-MB
01/06/2023
Pending - Other Pending
Property - Residential Eviction
Palm Beach, Florida
GARRISON , EDWARD A
INVESTMENTS LIMITED
JHB FLORIDA PROPERTIES LLC
WATERWAY VILLAGE APARTMENTS
THEODORE , CENA
THEODORE , NAOMIE
KELLEY , JERRON
02/10/2023:AFFIDAVIT OF NON PAYMENT
01/30/2023:ORDER DIRECTING DFTS TO DEPOSIT ADDITIONAL FUNDS INTO THE CT REGISTRY OF $1640 NO LATER THAN 12:00 PM ON 2/17/23. DATED 1/30/23 E. GARRISON
01/27/2023:PAID $0.15 ON RECEIPT 4758629
01/27/2023:MOTION F/B DEFT
01/27/2023:PAID $1,671.50 ON RECEIPT 4758530
01/23/2023:NOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION
01/19/2023:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)
01/19/2023:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)
01/18/2023:ORDER DIRECTING DEFENDANT(S) TO DEPOSIT FUNDS INTO THE COURT REGISTRY JUDGE GARRISON ON 1/18/23
01/18/2023:CERTIFICATE OF MAILING
01/18/2023:CERTIFICATE OF MAILING
01/17/2023:PAID $1.35 ON RECEIPT 4745359
01/17/2023:MOTION TO DETERMINE RENT ;F /B DFTS
01/17/2023:RESPONSE TO: EVICTION COMPLAINT ; F/B DFTS
01/06/2023:PAID $205.00 ON RECEIPT 4734424
01/06/2023:SUMMONS ISSUED
01/06/2023:SUMMONS ISSUED
01/06/2023:COMPLAINT FOR TENANT EVICTION
DocketAFFIDAVIT OF NON PAYMENT; Notes: F/B PLT
[-] Read LessDocketORDER DIRECTING DFTS TO DEPOSIT ADDITIONAL FUNDS INTO THE CT REGISTRY OF $1640 NO LATER THAN 12:00 PM ON 2/17/23. DATED 1/30/23 E. GARRISON; Notes: DIRECTING DFTS TO DEPOSIT ADDITIONAL FUNDS INTO THE CT REGISTRY OF $1640 NO LATER THAN 12:00 PM ON 2/17/23. DATED 1/30/23 E. GARRISON
[-] Read LessFinancialReceipt Number: 4758629; Receipt Amount: $0.15
[-] Read LessFinancialReceipt Number: 4758530; Receipt Amount: $31.50
[-] Read LessFinancialReceipt Number: 4758530; Receipt Amount: $640.00
[-] Read LessFinancialReceipt Number: 4758530; Receipt Amount: $1,000.00
[-] Read LessFinancialTotals:; total Amount Due: $1,878.00; total Amount Paid: $1,878.00; total-Amount Balance: $0.00
[-] Read LessFinancialDue Date: 01/27/2023; Description: CC County Civil Service Charges PB 01262020; Amount Due: $0.15; Amount Paid: $0.15; Amount Balance: $0.00
[-] Read LessFinancialDue Date: 01/27/2023; Description: Other Registry Fee PB; Amount Due: $31.50; Amount Paid: $31.50; Amount Balance: $0.00
[-] Read LessFinancialDue Date: 01/27/2023; Description: Other Registry Deposit PB; Amount Due: $1,640.00; Amount Paid: $1,640.00; Amount Balance: $0.00
[-] Read LessFinancialReceipt Number: 4734424; Receipt Amount: $205.00
[-] Read LessFinancialDue Date: 01/06/2023; Description: e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Amount Balance: $0.00
[-] Read LessFinancialDue Date: 01/06/2023; Description: e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Amount Balance: $0.00
[-] Read LessFinancialDue Date: 01/06/2023; Description: 401FF County Civil Tenant Eviction; Amount Due: $185.00; Amount Paid: $185.00; Amount Balance: $0.00
[-] Read LessDocketPAID $205.00 ON RECEIPT 4734424; Notes: $205.00 4734424 Fully Paid
[-] Read LessDocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: eservice@kelleygrantlaw.com NAOMIE THEODORE
[-] Read LessDocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: eservice@kelleygrantlaw.com CENA THEODORE
[-] Read LessDocketCOMPLAINT FOR TENANT EVICTION; Notes: F/B PLT
[-] Read LessDocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Notes: F/B PLT
[-] Read LessDocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes: RL: County Civil Central - RL (Civil)
[-] Read Less