This case was last updated from Palm Beach County 15th Judicial Circuit Courts on 02/15/2023 at 19:04:34 (UTC).

WATERWAY VILLAGE APARTMENTS V THEODORE, CENA

Case Summary

On 01/06/2023 WATERWAY VILLAGE APARTMENTS filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against THEODORE, CENA. This case was filed in Palm Beach County 15th Judicial Circuit Courts, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is GARRISON , EDWARD A. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    01/06/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

GARRISON , EDWARD A

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

INVESTMENTS LIMITED

JHB FLORIDA PROPERTIES LLC

WATERWAY VILLAGE APARTMENTS

Defendants and Respondents

THEODORE , CENA

THEODORE , NAOMIE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

KELLEY , JERRON

 

Court Documents

AFFIDAVIT OF NON PAYMENT

02/10/2023:AFFIDAVIT OF NON PAYMENT

ORDER DIRECTING DFTS TO DEPOSIT ADDITIONAL FUNDS INTO THE CT REGISTRY OF $1640 NO LATER THAN 12:00 PM ON 2/17/23. DATED 1/30/23 E. GARRISON

01/30/2023:ORDER DIRECTING DFTS TO DEPOSIT ADDITIONAL FUNDS INTO THE CT REGISTRY OF $1640 NO LATER THAN 12:00 PM ON 2/17/23. DATED 1/30/23 E. GARRISON

PAID $0.15 ON RECEIPT 4758629

01/27/2023:PAID $0.15 ON RECEIPT 4758629

MOTION F/B DEFT

01/27/2023:MOTION F/B DEFT

PAID $1,671.50 ON RECEIPT 4758530

01/27/2023:PAID $1,671.50 ON RECEIPT 4758530

NOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION

01/23/2023:NOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

01/19/2023:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

01/19/2023:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

ORDER DIRECTING DEFENDANT(S) TO DEPOSIT FUNDS INTO THE COURT REGISTRY JUDGE GARRISON ON 1/18/23

01/18/2023:ORDER DIRECTING DEFENDANT(S) TO DEPOSIT FUNDS INTO THE COURT REGISTRY JUDGE GARRISON ON 1/18/23

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

01/18/2023:CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

01/18/2023:CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

PAID $1.35 ON RECEIPT 4745359

01/17/2023:PAID $1.35 ON RECEIPT 4745359

MOTION TO DETERMINE RENT ;F /B DFTS

01/17/2023:MOTION TO DETERMINE RENT ;F /B DFTS

RESPONSE TO: EVICTION COMPLAINT ; F/B DFTS

01/17/2023:RESPONSE TO: EVICTION COMPLAINT ; F/B DFTS

PAID $205.00 ON RECEIPT 4734424

01/06/2023:PAID $205.00 ON RECEIPT 4734424

SUMMONS ISSUED

01/06/2023:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

01/06/2023:SUMMONS ISSUED

COMPLAINT FOR TENANT EVICTION

01/06/2023:COMPLAINT FOR TENANT EVICTION

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF NON PAYMENT; Notes: F/B PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER DIRECTING DFTS TO DEPOSIT ADDITIONAL FUNDS INTO THE CT REGISTRY OF $1640 NO LATER THAN 12:00 PM ON 2/17/23. DATED 1/30/23 E. GARRISON; Notes: DIRECTING DFTS TO DEPOSIT ADDITIONAL FUNDS INTO THE CT REGISTRY OF $1640 NO LATER THAN 12:00 PM ON 2/17/23. DATED 1/30/23 E. GARRISON

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • FinancialReceipt Number: 4758629; Receipt Amount: $0.15

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • FinancialReceipt Number: 4758530; Receipt Amount: $31.50

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • FinancialReceipt Number: 4758530; Receipt Amount: $640.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • FinancialReceipt Number: 4758530; Receipt Amount: $1,000.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • FinancialTotals:; total Amount Due: $1,878.00; total Amount Paid: $1,878.00; total-Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • FinancialDue Date: 01/27/2023; Description: CC County Civil Service Charges PB 01262020; Amount Due: $0.15; Amount Paid: $0.15; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • FinancialDue Date: 01/27/2023; Description: Other Registry Fee PB; Amount Due: $31.50; Amount Paid: $31.50; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • FinancialDue Date: 01/27/2023; Description: Other Registry Deposit PB; Amount Due: $1,640.00; Amount Paid: $1,640.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 01/06/2023
  • FinancialReceipt Number: 4734424; Receipt Amount: $205.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • FinancialDue Date: 01/06/2023; Description: e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • FinancialDue Date: 01/06/2023; Description: e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • FinancialDue Date: 01/06/2023; Description: 401FF County Civil Tenant Eviction; Amount Due: $185.00; Amount Paid: $185.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $205.00 ON RECEIPT 4734424; Notes: $205.00 4734424 Fully Paid

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: eservice@kelleygrantlaw.com NAOMIE THEODORE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: eservice@kelleygrantlaw.com CENA THEODORE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR TENANT EVICTION; Notes: F/B PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Notes: F/B PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes: RL: County Civil Central - RL (Civil)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less