This case was last updated from Palm Beach County 15th Judicial Circuit Courts on 03/01/2023 at 19:07:19 (UTC).

WATERWAY VILLAGE APARTMENTS V LOUIS, ELIZABETH

Case Summary

On 01/20/2023 WATERWAY VILLAGE APARTMENTS filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against LOUIS, ELIZABETH. This case was filed in Palm Beach County 15th Judicial Circuit Courts, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is TEW , STEPHANIE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    01/20/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

TEW , STEPHANIE

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

INVESTMENTS LIMITED

JHB FLORIDA PROPERTIES LLC

WATERWAY VILLAGE APARTMENTS

Defendant and Respondent

LOUIS , ELIZABETH

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

KELLEY , JERRON

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

01/20/2023:CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT FOR TENANT EVICTION

01/20/2023:COMPLAINT FOR TENANT EVICTION

SUMMONS ISSUED

01/20/2023:SUMMONS ISSUED

PAID $195.00 ON RECEIPT 4752049

01/23/2023:PAID $195.00 ON RECEIPT 4752049

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

01/27/2023:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

02/01/2023:CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

ANSWER

02/01/2023:ANSWER

MOTION TO STRIKE

02/03/2023:MOTION TO STRIKE

DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT BOOK 34114 PAGE 751-751

02/07/2023:DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT BOOK 34114 PAGE 751-751

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED

02/14/2023:WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

02/23/2023:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes: AS TO ELIZABETH LOUIS SERVED 2/16/23 10:42 AM EXECUTED 2/22/23

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED; Notes: FWD TO PBSO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2023
  • DocketDISPOSED BY DEFAULT; Notes: DD - DISPOSED BY DEFAULT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT BOOK 34114 PAGE 751-751; Notes: JUDGE TEW DTD 2/7/23

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO STRIKE; Notes: DFT'S PLEADING AND FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT F/B PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER; Notes: EVICTION SUMMONS/RESIDENTISL - F/B DFT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MAILING; Notes: ELIZABETH LOUIS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes: RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED ELIZABETH LOUIS - 01/25/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • FinancialReceipt Number: 4752049; Receipt Amount: $195.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • FinancialTotals:; total Amount Due: $195.00; total Amount Paid: $195.00; total-Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • FinancialDue Date: 01/23/2023; Description: e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • FinancialDue Date: 01/23/2023; Description: 401FF County Civil Tenant Eviction; Amount Due: $185.00; Amount Paid: $185.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $195.00 ON RECEIPT 4752049; Notes: $195.00 4752049 Fully Paid

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes: RJ: County Civil Central - RJ (Civil)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: eservice@kelleygrantlaw.com

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR TENANT EVICTION; Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less