This case was last updated from Palm Beach County 15th Judicial Circuit Courts on 02/15/2023 at 19:06:36 (UTC).

WATERWAY VILLAGE APARTMENTS V GANESH, KAREN

Case Summary

On 01/06/2023 WATERWAY VILLAGE APARTMENTS filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against GANESH, KAREN. This case was filed in Palm Beach County 15th Judicial Circuit Courts, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is SHULLMAN , SARAH L. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    01/06/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

SHULLMAN , SARAH L

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

INVESTMENTS LIMITED

JHB FLORIDA PROPERTIES LLC

WATERWAY VILLAGE APARTMENTS

Defendant and Respondent

GANESH , KAREN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

KELLEY , JERRON

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

01/06/2023:CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT FOR TENANT EVICTION

01/06/2023:COMPLAINT FOR TENANT EVICTION

SUMMONS ISSUED

01/06/2023:SUMMONS ISSUED

PAID $195.00 ON RECEIPT 4734254

01/06/2023:PAID $195.00 ON RECEIPT 4734254

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

01/18/2023:CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

01/19/2023:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT/REPORT

01/20/2023:NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT/REPORT

MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT

01/20/2023:MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT

MOTION FOR DEFAULT

01/20/2023:MOTION FOR DEFAULT

CLERK'S DEFAULT

01/26/2023:CLERK'S DEFAULT

FINAL JUDGMENT BOOK 34098 PAGE 539-539

01/30/2023:FINAL JUDGMENT BOOK 34098 PAGE 539-539

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED

02/08/2023:WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED; Notes: FWD TO PBSO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • DocketDISPOSED BY DEFAULT; Notes: DD - DISPOSED BY DEFAULT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFINAL JUDGMENT BOOK 34098 PAGE 539-539; Notes: AS TO COUNT I ONLY FOR POSSESSION. DATED 1/30/23 S. SHULLMAN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S DEFAULT; Notes: ESERVICE@KELLEYGRANTLAW.COM KAREN GANESH

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT; Notes: AGAINST KAREN GANESH F/B PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT; Notes: F/B DFT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT/REPORT; Notes: AS TO KAREN GANESH F/B PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes: RETURN OF SERVICE SUBSTITUTE KAREN GANESH - 01/09/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MAILING; Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • FinancialReceipt Number: 4734254; Receipt Amount: $195.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • FinancialTotals:; total Amount Due: $195.00; total Amount Paid: $195.00; total-Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • FinancialDue Date: 01/06/2023; Description: e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • FinancialDue Date: 01/06/2023; Description: 401FF County Civil Tenant Eviction; Amount Due: $185.00; Amount Paid: $185.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $195.00 ON RECEIPT 4734254; Notes: $195.00 4734254 Fully Paid

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: eservice@kelleygrantlaw.com E-ISSUED TO ATTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR TENANT EVICTION; Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes: RE: County Civil Central - RE (Civil)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less