This case was last updated from Palm Beach County 15th Judicial Circuit Courts on 02/15/2023 at 19:02:32 (UTC).

WATERWAY VILLAGE APARTMENTS V AKTER, EYERIN

Case Summary

On 01/06/2023 WATERWAY VILLAGE APARTMENTS filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against AKTER, EYERIN. This case was filed in Palm Beach County 15th Judicial Circuit Courts, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is GARRISON , EDWARD A. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    01/06/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

GARRISON , EDWARD A

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

INVESTMENTS LIMITED

JHB FLORIDA PROPERTIES LLC

WATERWAY VILLAGE APARTMENTS

Defendants and Respondents

AKTER , EYERIN

RAHAMAN , MD M

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

KELLEY , JERRON

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

01/06/2023:CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT FOR TENANT EVICTION

01/06/2023:COMPLAINT FOR TENANT EVICTION

SUMMONS ISSUED

01/06/2023:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

01/06/2023:SUMMONS ISSUED

PAID $205.00 ON RECEIPT 4735802

01/09/2023:PAID $205.00 ON RECEIPT 4735802

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

01/18/2023:CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

01/18/2023:CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

01/19/2023:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

01/19/2023:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT/REPORT

01/26/2023:NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT/REPORT

NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT/REPORT

01/26/2023:NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT/REPORT

MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT

01/26/2023:MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT

MOTION FOR DEFAULT

01/26/2023:MOTION FOR DEFAULT

CLERK'S DEFAULT

01/31/2023:CLERK'S DEFAULT

FINAL JUDGMENT BOOK 34110 PAGE 584-584

02/06/2023:FINAL JUDGMENT BOOK 34110 PAGE 584-584

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED

02/09/2023:WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

02/09/2023
View Court Documents

DocketWRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED; Notes: FWD TO PBSO

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/06/2023

DocketDISPOSED BY DEFAULT; Notes: DD - DISPOSED BY DEFAULT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/06/2023
View Court Documents

DocketFINAL JUDGMENT BOOK 34110 PAGE 584-584; Notes: AS TO COUNT I ONLY FOR POSSESSION - SIGNED JUDGE GARRISON 2/6/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/31/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCLERK'S DEFAULT; Notes: ESERVICE@KELLEYGRANTLAW.COM EYERIN AKTER MD M. RAHAMAN

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/26/2023
View Court Documents

DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT; Notes: BY CLERK F/B PLT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/26/2023
View Court Documents

DocketMOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT; Notes: FOR EVICTION F/B PLT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/26/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT/REPORT; Notes: IN RE MD M RAHMAN F/B PLT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/26/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT/REPORT; Notes: IN RE EYERIN AKTER F/B PLT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/19/2023
View Court Documents

DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes: RETURN OF SERVICE POSTED MD M. RAHAMAN - 01/10/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/19/2023
View Court Documents

DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes: RETURN OF SERVICE POSTED EYERIN AKTER - 01/10/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
3 More Docket Entries
01/09/2023

FinancialTotals:; total Amount Due: $205.00; total Amount Paid: $205.00; total-Amount Balance: $0.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/09/2023

FinancialDue Date: 01/09/2023; Description: e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/09/2023

FinancialDue Date: 01/09/2023; Description: e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/09/2023

FinancialDue Date: 01/09/2023; Description: 401FF County Civil Tenant Eviction; Amount Due: $185.00; Amount Paid: $185.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/09/2023
View Court Documents

DocketPAID $205.00 ON RECEIPT 4735802; Notes: $205.00 4735802 Fully Paid

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/09/2023

DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes: RL: County Civil Central - RL (Civil)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/06/2023
View Court Documents

DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: eservice@kelleygrantlaw.com MD M RAHAMAN

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/06/2023
View Court Documents

DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: eservice@kelleygrantlaw.com EYERIN AKTER

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/06/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCOMPLAINT FOR TENANT EVICTION; Notes: F/B PLT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/06/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Notes: F/B PLT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less