This case was last updated from Not Yet Classified on 03/08/2023 at 10:00:03 (UTC).

WATERMAN, GLORIA

Case Summary

On 05/17/2022 WATERMAN, GLORIA was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Not Yet Classified, Not Yet Classified located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is JOHNSON , LAURA. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-NB

  • Filing Date:

    05/17/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Courthouse:

    Not Yet Classified

Judge Details

Judge

JOHNSON , LAURA

 

Party Details

Petitioners

WATERMAN , BRIAN

WATERMAN , LISA

Decedent

WATERMAN , GLORIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

RITTER , GREGORY J

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/15/2022
  • DocketORDER SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION; Notes: S/B JUDGE JOHNSON 8/15/22

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2022
  • DocketDISPOSED BY JUDGE; Notes: DJ - DISPOSED BY JUDGE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2022
  • DocketREPRESENTATIVE ATTORNEY: RITTER, GREGORY J; Notes: REPRESENTATIVE ATTORNEY: RITTER, GREGORY J

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2022
  • DocketPETITIONER: WATERMAN, LISA; Notes: Petitioner: WATERMAN, LISA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2022
  • DocketORDER SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION BOOK 33788 PAGE 1496-1496; Notes: S/B JUDGE JOHNSON 8/15/22

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2022
  • DocketORDER ADMITTING WILL; Notes: TO PROBATE S/B JUDGE JOHNSON 8/15/22

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • DocketORDER TO TRANSFER TO DIVISION IA; Notes: ORDER DIRECTING CLERK & COMPTROLLER TO TRANSFER CASE TO DIVISION "IA" (OTIA) GLENN D. KELLEY 07/25/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • DocketPROBATE CHECKLIST; Notes: CHECKLIST FOR PETITION FOR SUMMARY ANCILLARY ADMINISTRATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2022
  • DocketSTATUS ORDER; Notes: JOHNSON: LISTED ITEMS ARE REQUIRED TO BE FILED WITHIN 30 DAYS DTD 7-15-22

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketAUTHENTICATED/EXEMPLIFIED COPY BOOK 33789 PAGE 57-56; Notes: "ORIGINAL" F/B ATTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 05/18/2022
  • DocketPAID $346.00 ON RECEIPT 4469123; Notes: $346.00 4469123 Fully Paid

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes: IH: North Branch Probate, MH, Guardianship - IH (Civil)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • DocketDEATH CERTIFICATE; Notes: OF STEPHEN H. WATERMAN F/B LISA WATERMAN & BRIAN WATERMAN E-FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • DocketDEATH CERTIFICATE; Notes: OF MICHAEL B. WATERMAN F/B LISA WATERMAN & BRIAN WATERMAN E-FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • DocketDEATH CERT PROBATE DECEDENT; Notes: F/B LISA WATERMAN & BRIAN WATERMAN E-FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • DocketPAID FUNERAL BILL; Notes: F/B LISA WATERMAN & BRIAN WATERMAN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • DocketNON-TAX CERT/RCPT/AFFIDAVIT; Notes: F/B LISA WATERMAN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Notes: CONCERNING CRIMINAL HISTORY F/B LISA WATERMAN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • DocketAUTHENTICATED/EXEMPLIFIED COPY; Notes: FROM THE STATE OF NEW YORK SUFFOLK COUNTY F/B LISA WATERMAN & BRIAN WATERMAN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • DocketPETITION FOR SUMMARY ADMIN; Notes: FOR ANCILLARY F/B LISA WATERMAN & BRIAN WATERMAN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less