This case was last updated from Florida Palm Beach Court System on 02/19/2021 at 17:41:14 (UTC).

WARD, WAYNE

Case Summary

On 01/15/2021 WARD, WAYNE was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Florida Palm Beach Court System, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are SUSKAUER , SCOTT and WILLIS , SARAH. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-NB

  • Filing Date:

    01/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Florida Palm Beach Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Main Branch

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

SUSKAUER , SCOTT

WILLIS , SARAH

 

Party Details

Petitioner

WARD , SARAI

Decedent

WARD , WAYNE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

SOSA , HORACIO

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketOBJECTION TO CLAIM; Notes:OF PHILLIPS & COHEN OBO BARCLAYS BANK F/B PR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • DocketNON-TAX CERT/RCPT/AFFIDAVIT; Notes:AFFIDAVIT OF NO FLORIDA ESTATE TAX DUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • DocketCLERK NOTICE NOT CONFIDENTIAL; Notes:EMAILED TO ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL FILING; Notes:F/B ATTY SOSA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Notes:AFFIDAVIT OF HEIRS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Notes:AFFIDAVIT CONCERNING CRIMINAL HISTORY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Notes:F/B BARCLAYS BANK EMAILED TO ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • DocketPETITION DETERMINING HOMESTEAD; Notes:F/B PETR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketDEATH CERT PROBATE DECEDENT; Notes:ORIGINAL F/B PETR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketDEATH CERT PROBATE DECEDENT; Notes:COPY F/B PETR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • FinancialReceipt Number:3875543; Receipt Amount: $382.10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • FinancialTotals: total Amount Due:$382.10; total Amount Paid:$382.10; total-Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • FinancialDue Date:01/15/2021; Description:VD2P Volun Diss Each Additional Page $8.50; Amount Due:$25.50; Amount Paid:$25.50; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • FinancialDue Date:01/15/2021; Description:VD1P Volun Diss 1st Page $10.00; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • FinancialDue Date:01/15/2021; Description:Efiling VDAL Legal Description $0.60; Amount Due:$0.60; Amount Paid:$0.60; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • FinancialDue Date:01/15/2021; Description:502FF Summary Administration $1000 or more; Amount Due:$346.00; Amount Paid:$346.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketPAID $382.10 ON RECEIPT 3875543; Notes:$382.10 3875543 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketPETITION FOR SUMMARY ADMIN BOOK 32109 PAGE 476-479; Notes:F/B PETITIONER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes:IJ: North Branch Probate - IJ (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Sosa, Horacio A