This case was last updated from Florida Palm Beach Court System on 09/29/2021 at 20:00:05 (UTC).

WALKER, KALYN ASHLEY V FINANCIAL INDUSTRY REGULATORY AUTHORITY INC

Case Summary

On 08/25/2021 WALKER, KALYN ASHLEY filed a Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange lawsuit against FINANCIAL INDUSTRY REGULATORY AUTHORITY INC. This case was filed in Florida Palm Beach Court System, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is SCHOSBERG_FEUER , SAMANTHA. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    08/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

SCHOSBERG_FEUER , SAMANTHA

 

Party Details

Petitioners and Plaintiffs

WALKER , KALYN ASHLEY

ZEIGLER , PERRY A

Defendant and Respondent

FINANCIAL INDUSTRY REGULATORY AUTHORITY INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff Attorney

SIMMS , JOELLE A

 

Court Documents

FINAL JUDGMENT BOOK 32894 PAGE 1484-1485

09/15/2021:FINAL JUDGMENT BOOK 32894 PAGE 1484-1485

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

08/30/2021:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

PAID $411.00 ON RECEIPT 4154979

08/26/2021:PAID $411.00 ON RECEIPT 4154979

SUMMONS ISSUED

08/25/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED

PETITION

08/25/2021:PETITION

CIVIL COVER SHEET

08/25/2021:CIVIL COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketDISPOSED BY JUDGE; Notes:DJ - DISPOSED BY JUDGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFINAL JUDGMENT BOOK 32894 PAGE 1484-1485; Notes:SSCHOSGFEUER DTD 9/15/21 AND FINAL ORDER CONFIRMING ARBITRATION AWARD AND EXPUNGEMENT -GRANTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes:RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED FINANCIAL INDUSTRY REGULATORY AUTHORITY, INC - 08/27/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • FinancialReceipt Number:4154979; Receipt Amount: $411.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • FinancialTotals: total Amount Due:$411.00; total Amount Paid:$411.00; total-Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • FinancialDue Date:08/26/2021; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • FinancialDue Date:08/26/2021; Description:800FF - Circuit Civil General PB; Amount Due:$401.00; Amount Paid:$401.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $411.00 ON RECEIPT 4154979; Notes:$411.00 4154979 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes:AH: Circuit Civil Central - AH (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes:jsimms@bressler.com;ktoulon@bressler.com AS TO DFT FINANCIAL INDUSTRY REGULATORY AUTHORITY INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITION; Notes:IN THE FORM OF A MOT TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION AWARD AND FOR ENTRY OF FINAL JUDGMENT CONFIRMING ARBITRATION AWARD AND EXPUNGEMENT. F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Financial Industry Regulatory Authority, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SIMMS , JOELLE A