This case was last updated from Palm Beach County Courts on 04/20/2022 at 09:36:48 (UTC).

WALDMAN, JUDY V COMCAST CABLE COMMUNICATIONS LLC

Case Summary

On 12/03/2021 WALDMAN, JUDY filed an Other lawsuit against COMCAST CABLE COMMUNICATIONS LLC. This case was filed in Palm Beach County Courts, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MARX , JOSEPH. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    12/03/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MARX , JOSEPH

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

WALDMAN , JUDY

Defendants and Respondents

AT&T MOBILITY SERVICES LLC

CITY OF WEST PALM BEACH

COMCAST CABLE COMMUNICATIONS LLC

CYPRESS COMMUNICATIONS INC

FLORIDA POWER & LIGHT COMPANY

BELLSOUTH TELECOMMUNICATIONS LLC

COMCAST OF FLORIDA/MICHIGAN/NEW MEXICO/PENNSYLVANIA/WASHINGTON LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

GREER , PHILIP

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

DIAMOND , PETER A

LAMB , SHAWNA G

WEIGER JR., DAVID A

PELINO ESQ, ANDREW M

 

Court Documents

RESPONSE TO REQ TO PRODUCE

04/15/2022:RESPONSE TO REQ TO PRODUCE

MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

04/14/2022:MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

04/14/2022:MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

04/13/2022:MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

04/13/2022:MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

CERTIFICATE

04/11/2022:CERTIFICATE

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

04/07/2022:REQUEST TO PRODUCE

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

04/07/2022:REQUEST TO PRODUCE

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

04/07/2022:REQUEST TO PRODUCE

PAID $451.00 ON RECEIPT 4272065

12/07/2021:PAID $451.00 ON RECEIPT 4272065

SUMMONS ISSUED

12/03/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

12/03/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

12/03/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

12/03/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

12/03/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED

DIFFERENTIATED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN STANDING ORDER

12/03/2021:DIFFERENTIATED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN STANDING ORDER

COMPLAINT

12/03/2021:COMPLAINT

CIVIL COVER SHEET

12/03/2021:CIVIL COVER SHEET

67 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQ TO PRODUCE; Notes:DEFENDANT CITY OF WEST PALM BEACH'S RESPONSE TO CYPRESS COMMUNICATION, INC.'S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME; Notes:TO RESPOND TO DFT CYPRESS COMMUNICATION INC REQUEST FOR DISCOVERY F/B DFT COMCAST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME; Notes:TO RESPOND TO CO-DFT CYPRESS COMMUNICATION INC'S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION F/B DFT FLORIDA POWER & LIGHT COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME; Notes:TO RESPOND TO DFT AT&T REQUEST FOR DISCOVERY F/B DFT COMCAST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME; Notes:TO RESPOND TO DFT AT&T'S FIRST SET OF DISCOVERY TO THE PLT F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE; Notes:CERTIFICATE OF NON-OBJECTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Notes:CITY OF WEST PALM BEACH'S AMENDED REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO CYPRESS COMMUICATIONS, INC. (ATTACHES EXHIBIT)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Notes:CITY OF WEST PALM BEACH'S AMENDED REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO COMCAST CABLE COMMUNICATIONS, LLC (ATTACHES EXHIBIT)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Notes:CITY OF WEST PALM BEACH'S REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO CYPRESS COMMUICATIONS, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Notes:CITY OF WEST PALM BEACH'S REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO COMCAST CABLE COMMUNICATIONS, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
70 More Docket Entries
  • 12/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $451.00 ON RECEIPT 4272065; Notes:$451.00 4272065 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes:AJ: Circuit Civil Central - AJ (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes:eservice2@flinjuryfirm.com;records@flinjuryfirm.com;philip@flinjuryfirm.com AS TO FLORIDA POWER & LIGHT COMPANY EFILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes:eservice2@flinjuryfirm.com;records@flinjuryfirm.com;philip@flinjuryfirm.com AS TO CYPRESS COMMUNICATIONS INC EFILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes:eservice2@flinjuryfirm.com;records@flinjuryfirm.com;philip@flinjuryfirm.com AS TO COMCAST CABLE COMMUNICATIONS LLC EFILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes:eservice2@flinjuryfirm.com;records@flinjuryfirm.com;philip@flinjuryfirm.com AS TO CITY OF WEST PALM BEACH EFILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes:eservice2@flinjuryfirm.com;records@flinjuryfirm.com;philip@flinjuryfirm.com AS TO AT&T MOBILITY SERVICES LLC EFILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDIFFERENTIATED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN STANDING ORDER; Notes:F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Notes:AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CYPRESS COMMUNICATIONS INC is a litigant

Latest cases where Comcast Of Florida Michigan New Mexico Pennsylvania Washington Llc is a litigant

Latest cases where Comcast Cable Communications, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Florida Power & Light Company is a litigant