This case was last updated from Florida Palm Beach Court System on 02/01/2021 at 23:02:46 (UTC).

VINAS, LUIS V BEAZLEY USA SERVICES INC

Case Summary

On 01/22/2020 VINAS, LUIS filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against BEAZLEY USA SERVICES INC. This case was filed in Florida Palm Beach Court System, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are KERNER , SCOTT and MARX , JOSEPH. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    01/22/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Courthouse:

    Main Branch

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

KERNER , SCOTT

MARX , JOSEPH

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

VINAS , LUIS

Defendants and Respondents

BEAZLEY USA SERVICES INC

CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYD'S LONDON SUBSCRIBING TO POLICY OF INSURANCE NUMBER W3793519PNYH

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

KASPER , CHRIS

 

Court Documents

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

07/30/2020:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

MOTION PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT TO CORRECT AMOUNT OWED

07/21/2020:MOTION PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT TO CORRECT AMOUNT OWED

PAID $10.00 ON RECEIPT 3686906

07/17/2020:PAID $10.00 ON RECEIPT 3686906

SUMMONS ISSUED

07/14/2020:SUMMONS ISSUED

COMPLAINT

07/14/2020:COMPLAINT

RESPONSE TO REQ FOR ADMISSION

06/26/2020:RESPONSE TO REQ FOR ADMISSION

RESPONSE TO REQ TO PRODUCE

06/26/2020:RESPONSE TO REQ TO PRODUCE

ANSWER TO INTERROGATORIES

06/26/2020:ANSWER TO INTERROGATORIES

MOTION TO DISMISS

06/22/2020:MOTION TO DISMISS

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

02/24/2020:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

SUMMONS ISSUED

01/24/2020:SUMMONS ISSUED

PAID $411.00 ON RECEIPT 3506739

01/23/2020:PAID $411.00 ON RECEIPT 3506739

NOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION

01/22/2020:NOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

01/22/2020:REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

01/22/2020:REQUEST TO PRODUCE

~~CORRECT AND RESUBMIT SUMMONS NOT ISSUED MUST BE STYLED FOR THE CIRCUIT COURT.

01/22/2020:~~CORRECT AND RESUBMIT SUMMONS NOT ISSUED MUST BE STYLED FOR THE CIRCUIT COURT.

NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

01/22/2020:NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

COMPLAINT

01/22/2020:COMPLAINT

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes:VERIFIED RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYDS LONDON SUBSCRIBING TO POLICY OF INSURANCE NUMBER INSURANCE NUMBER - 07/28/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT TO CORRECT AMOUNT OWED; Notes:PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT TO CORRECT AMOUNT OWED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • FinancialReceipt Number:3686906; Receipt Amount: $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • FinancialTotals: total Amount Due:$421.00; total Amount Paid:$421.00; total-Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • FinancialDue Date:07/17/2020; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $10.00 ON RECEIPT 3686906; Notes:$10.00 3686906 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes:efile2@wesetthestandards.com AS TO DFT CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYD'S LONDON SUBSCRIBING TO POLICY OF INSURANCE NUMBER W3793519PNYH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Notes:AMENDED. F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQ FOR ADMISSION; Notes:DEFENDANT BEAZLEY USA SERVICES, INC.'S RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQ TO PRODUCE; Notes:DEFENDANT BEAZLEY USA SERVICES, INC.'S RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 01/23/2020
  • FinancialDue Date:01/23/2020; Description:800FF - Circuit Civil General PB; Amount Due:$401.00; Amount Paid:$401.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $411.00 ON RECEIPT 3506739; Notes:$411.00 3506739 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes:AJ: Circuit Civil Central - AJ (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION; Notes:F/B ATTY KASPER OBO PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Notes:FIRST REQUEST F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Notes:FIRST REQUEST F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket~~CORRECT AND RESUBMIT SUMMONS NOT ISSUED MUST BE STYLED FOR THE CIRCUIT COURT.; Notes:EFILE2@WESETTHESTANDARDS.COM MUST BE STYLED FOR THE CIRCUIT COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS; Notes:NOTICE OF SERICE OF FIRST INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Notes:F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BEAZLEY USA SERVICES INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION DBA BEAZLEY INSURANCE SERVICES is a litigant

Latest cases where CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYDS LONDON SUBSCRIBING TO POLICY NUMBER B1180D190825/1197JK is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KASPER , CHRIS