This case was last updated from Palm Beach County Courts on 02/27/2022 at 03:25:50 (UTC).

VILLAGE OF SANDALWOOD LAKES SOUTH HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC. V LUSTGARDEN, AMBER

Case Summary

On 01/19/2022 VILLAGE OF SANDALWOOD LAKES SOUTH HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC filed an Other lawsuit against LUSTGARDEN, AMBER. This case was filed in Palm Beach County Courts, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is PARNOFIELLO , JOHN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    01/19/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

PARNOFIELLO , JOHN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

VILLAGE OF SANDALWOOD LAKES SOUTH HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC.

Defendants and Respondents

KING , DAMIEN

LUSTGARDEN , AMBER

UNKNOWN TENANT #!

UNKNOWN TENANT #2

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

ROSSIN , ALLEN E

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

01/19/2022:CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

01/19/2022:COMPLAINT

~~CORRECT AND RESUBMIT SUMMONS NOT ISSUED COUNTY AND NOT CIRCUIT- A CASE MANAGEMENT STANDING ORDER MUST BE ATTACHED TO THIS SUMMONS OR FILED IN THE SAME FILING PER A.O. 3.107 PAGES 10 & 11. THANK YOU

01/19/2022:~~CORRECT AND RESUBMIT SUMMONS NOT ISSUED COUNTY AND NOT CIRCUIT- A CASE MANAGEMENT STANDING ORDER MUST BE ATTACHED TO THIS SUMMONS OR FILED IN THE SAME FILING PER A.O. 3.107 PAGES 10 & 11. THANK YOU

~~CORRECT AND RESUBMIT SUMMONS NOT ISSUED COUNTY AND NOT CIRCUIT- A CASE MANAGEMENT STANDING ORDER MUST BE ATTACHED TO THIS SUMMONS OR FILED IN THE SAME FILING PER A.O. 3.107 PAGES 10 & 11. THANK YOU

01/19/2022:~~CORRECT AND RESUBMIT SUMMONS NOT ISSUED COUNTY AND NOT CIRCUIT- A CASE MANAGEMENT STANDING ORDER MUST BE ATTACHED TO THIS SUMMONS OR FILED IN THE SAME FILING PER A.O. 3.107 PAGES 10 & 11. THANK YOU

SUMMONS ISSUED

01/26/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

01/26/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

PAID $420.00 ON RECEIPT 4325778

01/26/2022:PAID $420.00 ON RECEIPT 4325778

COMPLAINT

01/28/2022:COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ISSUED

01/28/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

01/28/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

PAID $20.00 ON RECEIPT 4330162

01/31/2022:PAID $20.00 ON RECEIPT 4330162

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

02/08/2022:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

02/08/2022:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

02/08/2022:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

02/08/2022:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

RESPONSE TO: AN "AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR REMOVAL AND INJUNCTION

02/22/2022:RESPONSE TO: AN "AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR REMOVAL AND INJUNCTION

PAID $2.10 ON RECEIPT 4357098

02/22/2022:PAID $2.10 ON RECEIPT 4357098

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/22/2022
  • FinancialReceipt Number:4357098; Receipt Amount: $2.10

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • FinancialTotals: total Amount Due:$442.10; total Amount Paid:$442.10; total-Amount Balance:$0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • FinancialDue Date:02/22/2022; Description:CC County Civil Service Charges PB 01262020; Amount Due:$2.10; Amount Paid:$2.10; Amount Balance:$0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $2.10 ON RECEIPT 4357098; Notes:$2.10 4357098 Fully Paid

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO: AN "AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR REMOVAL AND INJUNCTION; Notes:AN "AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR REMOVAL AND INJUNCTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes:RETURN OF SERVICE SUBSTITUTE DAMIEN KING - 2/1/22

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes:RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED AMBER LUSTGARDEN - 2/1/22

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes:RETURN OF SERVICE SUBSTITUTE UNKNOWN TENANT #2 - 2/1/22

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes:RETURN OF SERVICE SUBSTITUTE UNKNOWN TENANT - 2/1/22

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • FinancialReceipt Number:4330162; Receipt Amount: $20.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 01/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes:eservice@rossinburrlaw.com;cmalec@rossinburrlaw.com;mwallace@rossinburrlaw.com TO DFT AMBER LUSTGARDEN. E-ISSUED TO ATTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes:eservice@rossinburrlaw.com;cmalec@rossinburrlaw.com;mwallace@rossinburrlaw.com TO DFT DAMIEN KING. E-ISSUED TO ATTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • FinancialDue Date:01/20/2022; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • FinancialDue Date:01/20/2022; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • FinancialDue Date:01/20/2022; Description:4F07FF County Civil Claim > $15000 <= $30000; Amount Due:$400.00; Amount Paid:$400.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes:RJ: County Civil Central - RJ (Civil)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket~~CORRECT AND RESUBMIT SUMMONS NOT ISSUED COUNTY AND NOT CIRCUIT- A CASE MANAGEMENT STANDING ORDER MUST BE ATTACHED TO THIS SUMMONS OR FILED IN THE SAME FILING PER A.O. 3.107 PAGES 10 & 11. THANK YOU; Notes:eservice@rossinburrlaw.com;cmalec@rossinburrlaw.com;mwallace@rossinburrlaw.com COUNTY AND NOT CIRCUIT- A CASE MANAGEMENT STANDING ORDER MUST BE ATTACHED TO THIS SUMMONS OR FILED IN THE SAME FILING PER A.O. 3.107 PAGES 10 & 11. THANK YOU

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket~~CORRECT AND RESUBMIT SUMMONS NOT ISSUED COUNTY AND NOT CIRCUIT- A CASE MANAGEMENT STANDING ORDER MUST BE ATTACHED TO THIS SUMMONS OR FILED IN THE SAME FILING PER A.O. 3.107 PAGES 10 & 11. THANK YOU; Notes:eservice@rossinburrlaw.com;cmalec@rossinburrlaw.com;mwallace@rossinburrlaw.com COUNTY AND NOT CIRCUIT- A CASE MANAGEMENT STANDING ORDER MUST BE ATTACHED TO THIS SUMMONS OR FILED IN THE SAME FILING PER A.O. 3.107 PAGES 10 & 11. THANK YOU

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where VILLAGE OF SANDALWOOD LAKES SOUTH HOMEOWNERS is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ROSSIN , ALLEN E