This case was last updated from Florida Palm Beach Court System on 12/24/2021 at 15:14:42 (UTC).

VELOCITY INVESTMENTS, LLC V POLLOCK, HARRIS J

Case Summary

On 11/19/2021 VELOCITY INVESTMENTS, LLC filed an Other lawsuit against POLLOCK, HARRIS J. This case was filed in Florida Palm Beach Court System, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is SHULLMAN , SARAH L. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    11/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

SHULLMAN , SARAH L

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

VELOCITY INVESTMENTS, LLC

Respondent and Defendant

POLLOCK , HARRIS J

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

SINGER , JONATHAN R

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

11/19/2021:CIVIL COVER SHEET

DIFFERENTIATED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN STANDING ORDER

11/19/2021:DIFFERENTIATED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN STANDING ORDER

SUMMONS ISSUED

11/19/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED

COMPLAINT

11/19/2021:COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION

11/19/2021:NOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION

PAID $310.00 ON RECEIPT 4256578

11/22/2021:PAID $310.00 ON RECEIPT 4256578

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

12/08/2021:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes:VERIFIED RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED HARRIS J POLLOCK - 11/30/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • FinancialReceipt Number:4256578; Receipt Amount: $310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • FinancialTotals: total Amount Due:$310.00; total Amount Paid:$310.00; total-Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • FinancialDue Date:11/22/2021; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • FinancialDue Date:11/22/2021; Description:400FF County Civil Claim >$2500<= $15000; Amount Due:$300.00; Amount Paid:$300.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $310.00 ON RECEIPT 4256578; Notes:$310.00 4256578 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes:RE: County Civil Central - RE (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION; Notes:AND NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH RULE 2.516 F/B ATTY JONATHAN R SINGER F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Notes:ALLEGATIONS AS TO ALL COUNTS F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes:jsinger@ollawgroup.com;rchavez@ollawgroup.com;OL.IssuedSummons@provest.us

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDIFFERENTIATED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN STANDING ORDER; Notes:F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Notes:F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Velocity Investments LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Singer, Jonathan Robert, ESQ.