Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Palm Beach Court System on 04/16/2021 at 18:45:52 (UTC).

VELOCITY INVESTMENTS LLC V BENDER, DOUGLAS

Case Summary

On 04/06/2021 VELOCITY INVESTMENTS LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against BENDER, DOUGLAS. This case was filed in Florida Palm Beach Court System, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is GARRISON , EDWARD A. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    04/06/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Florida Palm Beach Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Main Branch

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

GARRISON , EDWARD A

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

VELOCITY INVESTMENTS LLC

Defendant and Respondent

BENDER , DOUGLAS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

SINGER , JONATHAN R

 

Court Documents

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

04/06/2021:STATEMENT OF CLAIM

SUMMONS ISSUED

04/07/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED

PAID $185.00 ON RECEIPT 3978080

04/07/2021:PAID $185.00 ON RECEIPT 3978080

NOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION

04/06/2021:NOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION

CIVIL COVER SHEET

04/06/2021:CIVIL COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/11/2021
  • HearingSCPTHA - Small Claims Pretrial Attorney; Location:MB; Room:ZOOM DIVISION RL (Main Branch)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • FinancialReceipt Number:3978080; Receipt Amount: $185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • FinancialTotals: total Amount Due:$185.00; total Amount Paid:$185.00; total-Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • FinancialDue Date:04/07/2021; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • FinancialDue Date:04/07/2021; Description:406FF County Civil Claim >$500 < $2500; Amount Due:$175.00; Amount Paid:$175.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes:JSINGER@OLLAWGROUP.COM TO DFT, E-ISSUED TO ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • DocketSET FOR SCPTHA - SMALL CLAIMS PRETRIAL ATTORNEY 5/11/2021 1:15 PM GARRISON, JUDGEEDWARD A; Notes:SCPTHA - Small Claims Pretrial Attorney 5/11/2021 1:15 PM GARRISON, JUDGEEDWARD A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $185.00 ON RECEIPT 3978080; Notes:$185.00 3978080 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes:RL: County Civil Central - RL (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Notes:FB PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION; Notes:FB PLTS ATTY JONATHAN R SINGER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Velocity Investments LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Singer, Jonathan Robert, ESQ.