This case was last updated from Palm Beach County 15th Judicial Circuit Courts on 02/19/2023 at 15:21:17 (UTC).

VELOCITY INVESTMENTS, LLC V ALBER, WILLIAM

Case Summary

On 01/10/2023 VELOCITY INVESTMENTS, LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against ALBER, WILLIAM. This case was filed in Palm Beach County 15th Judicial Circuit Courts, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is TEW , STEPHANIE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    01/10/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

TEW , STEPHANIE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

VELOCITY INVESTMENTS, LLC

Defendant and Respondent

ALBER , WILLIAM

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

SINGER , JONATHAN R

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

01/10/2023:CIVIL COVER SHEET

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

01/10/2023:STATEMENT OF CLAIM

NOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION

01/10/2023:NOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION

PAID $310.00 ON RECEIPT 4738671

01/11/2023:PAID $310.00 ON RECEIPT 4738671

SUMMONS ISSUED

01/11/2023:SUMMONS ISSUED

STIPULATION

01/24/2023:STIPULATION

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

02/01/2023:NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

ORDER OF DISMISSAL BOOK 34113 PAGE 462-462

02/01/2023:ORDER OF DISMISSAL BOOK 34113 PAGE 462-462

NOTICE OF SERVICE PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVICE

02/02/2023:NOTICE OF SERVICE PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVICE

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/09/2023
  • HearingCANCELLED - SCPTHA - Small Claims Pretrial Attorney; Location: MB; Room: 6J (Main Branch); Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVICE; Notes: PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER OF DISMISSAL BOOK 34113 PAGE 462-462; Notes: APPROVING STIPULATION - SIGNED JUDGE GARRISON 2/1/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • DocketDISMISSED BEFORE HEARING; Notes: DB - DISMISSED BEFORE HEARING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • DocketCancelled SCPTHA - Small Claims Pretrial Attorney on 2/9/2023 1:45:00 PM due to; Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Notes: WITH PREJUDICE F/B PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION; Notes: STIPULATION FOR SETTLEMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • FinancialReceipt Number: 4738671; Receipt Amount: $310.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • FinancialTotals:; total Amount Due: $310.00; total Amount Paid: $310.00; total-Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • FinancialDue Date: 01/11/2023; Description: e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • FinancialDue Date: 01/11/2023; Description: 400FF County Civil Claim >$2500<= $15000; Amount Due: $300.00; Amount Paid: $300.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: JSINGER@OLLAWGROUP.COM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • DocketSET FOR SCPTHA - SMALL CLAIMS PRETRIAL ATTORNEY 2/9/2023 1:45 PM TEW, STEPHANIE; Notes: SCPTHA - Small Claims Pretrial Attorney 2/9/2023 1:45 PM TEW, STEPHANIE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $310.00 ON RECEIPT 4738671; Notes: $310.00 4738671 Fully Paid

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes: RJ: County Civil Central - RJ (Civil)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION; Notes: AND NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH RULE 2.516 F/B ATTY JONATHAN R SINGER OBO PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Notes: F/B PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Notes: F/B PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less