This case was last updated from Florida Palm Beach Court System on 11/20/2019 at 19:09:53 (UTC).

VELOCITY COMMUNITY FEDERAL CREDIT UNION V SMITH, NICOLAS SHAWN

Case Summary

On 10/16/2019 VELOCITY COMMUNITY FEDERAL CREDIT UNION filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against SMITH, NICOLAS SHAWN. This case was filed in Florida Palm Beach Court System, North County Courthouse located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CASTOR , FRANK S. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-NB

  • Filing Date:

    10/16/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Florida Palm Beach Court System

  • Courthouse:

    North County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CASTOR , FRANK S

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

VELOCITY COMMUNITY FEDERAL CREDIT UNION

Defendant and Respondent

SMITH , NICOLAS SHAWN

 

Court Documents

HEARING BY COURT PRETRIAL

11/19/2019:HEARING BY COURT PRETRIAL

STIPULATION AND ORDER

11/19/2019:STIPULATION AND ORDER

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

11/18/2019:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

AFFIDAVIT OF INDEBTEDNESS

11/18/2019:AFFIDAVIT OF INDEBTEDNESS

NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT/REPORT

11/18/2019:NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT/REPORT

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

11/01/2019:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

SUMMONS ISSUED

10/17/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED

PAID $310.00 ON RECEIPT 3371622

10/17/2019:PAID $310.00 ON RECEIPT 3371622

CIVIL COVER SHEET

10/16/2019:CIVIL COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • HEARING BY COURT PRETRIAL; Notes:PARTIES PRESENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • DISMISSED AFTER HEARING; Notes:DA - DISMISSED AFTER HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • STIPULATION AND ORDER; Notes:FOR PAYMENT WITH JUDGMENT UPON DEFAULT AND ORDER DIRECTING CLERK TO CLOSE FILE-JUDGE CASTOR DTD 11/19/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes:SERVED ON NICOLAS S. SMITH ON 10/29/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • AFFIDAVIT OF INDEBTEDNESS; Notes:FB PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT/REPORT; Notes:FB PLT / NICOLAS SHAWN SMITH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes:BY PERSONAL SERVICE ON 10.29.19 FOR NICOLAS SHAWN SMITH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED; Notes:ASSETRECOVERY@VELOCITYCOMMUNITY.ORG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • SET FOR SCPTHP - SMALL CLAIMS PRETRIAL PRO SE 11/19/2019 9:00 AM CASTOR, JUDGEFRANK S; Notes:SCPTHP - Small Claims Pretrial Pro Se 11/19/2019 9:00 AM CASTOR, JUDGEFRANK S

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PAID $310.00 ON RECEIPT 3371622; Notes:$310.00 3371622 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • DIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes:RH: North Branch Cty Civ, SC, Evictions - RH (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • NOTICE OF FILING; Notes:CLOSED-END TRUTH-IN-LENDING STATEMENT F/B PROSE PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • STATEMENT OF CLAIM; Notes:F/B PROSE PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • AFFIDAVIT; Notes:AUTHORIZATION OF CORPORATE OFFICER F/B PROSE PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL COVER SHEET; Notes:F/B PROSE PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • Receipt Number:3371622; Receipt Amount: $310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • Totals: total Amount Due:$310.00; total Amount Paid:$310.00; total-Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • Due Date:10/17/2019; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • Due Date:10/17/2019; Description:400FF County Civil Claim > $2500; Amount Due:$300.00; Amount Paid:$300.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • SCPTHP - Small Claims Pretrial Pro Se; Location:NB; Room:#1 (North Branch)

    Read MoreRead Less