This case was last updated from Florida Palm Beach Court System on 09/28/2021 at 19:51:02 (UTC).

VASQUEZ, ALYSSA V ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 08/24/2021 VASQUEZ, ALYSSA filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Florida Palm Beach Court System, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MARX , JOSEPH. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    08/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MARX , JOSEPH

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

VASQUEZ , ALYSSA

Respondents and Defendants

ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

PALM BEACH COUNTY

WEHRLE , JAMES PATRICK

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

BOETTCHER , IAN

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

HOLTZ , SCOTT H

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

09/27/2021:REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

REQUEST FOR COPIES

09/24/2021:REQUEST FOR COPIES

NOTICE OF PRODUCTION NON PARTY

09/10/2021:NOTICE OF PRODUCTION NON PARTY

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

09/10/2021:REQUEST TO PRODUCE

NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

09/10/2021:NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL

09/09/2021:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL

PAID $431.00 ON RECEIPT 4153555

08/25/2021:PAID $431.00 ON RECEIPT 4153555

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

08/24/2021:REQUEST TO PRODUCE

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

08/24/2021:REQUEST TO PRODUCE

NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

08/24/2021:NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

SUMMONS ISSUED

08/24/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED

NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

08/24/2021:NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

SUMMONS ISSUED

08/24/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

08/24/2021:REQUEST TO PRODUCE

NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

08/24/2021:NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

SUMMONS ISSUED

08/24/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED

COMPLAINT

08/24/2021:COMPLAINT

CIVIL COVER SHEET

08/24/2021:CIVIL COVER SHEET

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Notes:NOTICE OF SERVING ADMISSION INTERROGATORIES TO PLT F/B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR COPIES; Notes:PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR COPIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PRODUCTION NON PARTY; Notes:PALM BEACH COUNTY'S NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTIES (RULE 1.351, FLORIDA RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Notes:PALM BEACH COUNTY'S FIRST REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS; Notes:PALM BEACH COUNTY'S FIRST INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL; Notes:AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ASSRESSES; SCOTT H. HOLTZ ESQ., ASST. CNTY. ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes:VERIFIED RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED PALM BEACH COUNTY - 09/03/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • FinancialReceipt Number:4153555; Receipt Amount: $431.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • FinancialTotals: total Amount Due:$431.00; total Amount Paid:$431.00; total-Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • FinancialDue Date:08/25/2021; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 08/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Notes:TO DFT F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS; Notes:TO DFT JAMES PTRICK WEHRLE F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes:iboettcher@forthepeople.com;aroark@forthepeople.com;lesquivel@forthepeople.com AS TO DFT JAMES PATRICK WEHRLE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS; Notes:TO DFT PALM BEACH COUNTY F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes:iboettcher@forthepeople.com;aroark@forthepeople.com;lesquivel@forthepeople.com AS TO DFT PALM BEACH COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Notes:TO DFT ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INS CO F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS; Notes:TO DFT ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INS CO F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes:iboettcher@forthepeople.com;aroark@forthepeople.com;lesquivel@forthepeople.com AS TO DFT ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Notes:F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BOETTCHER , IAN