This case was last updated from Palm Beach County Courts on 10/26/2022 at 22:47:57 (UTC).

VALENCIA ISLES HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC V WALKER, FRANCINE

Case Summary

On 09/16/2022 VALENCIA ISLES HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against WALKER, FRANCINE. This case was filed in Palm Beach County Courts, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is NUTT , JAMES. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    09/16/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

NUTT , JAMES

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

VALENCIA ISLES HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC

Defendants and Respondents

ELLMAN , ROBIN

TENANT , UNKNOWN

WALKER , FRANCINE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

GREEN , KAREN A

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

09/16/2022:CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

09/16/2022:COMPLAINT

LIS PENDENS

09/16/2022:LIS PENDENS

PAID $406.60 ON RECEIPT 4617878

09/19/2022:PAID $406.60 ON RECEIPT 4617878

SUMMONS ISSUED

09/22/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

09/22/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

09/22/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

PAID $30.00 ON RECEIPT 4624823

09/23/2022:PAID $30.00 ON RECEIPT 4624823

SERVICE RETURN- NOT SERVED

10/12/2022:SERVICE RETURN- NOT SERVED

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURN- NOT SERVED; Notes: VERIFIED RETURN OF SERVICE UNKNOWN TENANT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2022
  • FinancialReceipt Number: 4624823; Receipt Amount: $30.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2022
  • FinancialTotals:; total Amount Due: $436.60; total Amount Paid: $436.60; total-Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2022
  • FinancialDue Date: 09/23/2022; Description: e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2022
  • FinancialDue Date: 09/23/2022; Description: e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2022
  • FinancialDue Date: 09/23/2022; Description: e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $30.00 ON RECEIPT 4624823; Notes: $30.00 4624823 Fully Paid

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: Efilings@kbrlegal.com;kgreen@kbrlegal.com AS TO DFT FRANCINE WALKER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: Efilings@kbrlegal.com;kgreen@kbrlegal.com AS TO DFT ROBIN ELLMAN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: Efilings@kbrlegal.com;kgreen@kbrlegal.com AS TO DFT UNKNOWN TENANT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • FinancialReceipt Number: 4617878; Receipt Amount: $406.60

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • FinancialDue Date: 09/19/2022; Description: Lis Pendens 1st Page $5.60; Amount Due: $5.60; Amount Paid: $5.60; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • FinancialDue Date: 09/19/2022; Description: 800F1 CircCivil Real Prop $50,000 or < PB; Amount Due: $401.00; Amount Paid: $401.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $406.60 ON RECEIPT 4617878; Notes: $406.60 4617878 Fully Paid

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes: AO: Circuit Civil Central - AO (Civil)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLIS PENDENS BOOK 33853 PAGE 649-649; Notes: F/B PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Notes: FOR FORECLOSURE F/B PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where VALENCIA ISLES HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KAREN ANN GREEN