This case was last updated from Palm Beach County 15th Judicial Circuit Courts on 12/27/2022 at 22:54:22 (UTC).

INVESTMENTS LIMITED V SEA GLASS GRILL LLC, A FLORIDA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Case Summary

On 11/17/2022 INVESTMENTS LIMITED filed a Property - Other Property lawsuit against SEA GLASS GRILL LLC, A FLORIDA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY. This case was filed in Palm Beach County 15th Judicial Circuit Courts, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is KASTRENAKES , JOHN S. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    11/17/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

KASTRENAKES , JOHN S

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

INVESTMENTS LIMITED

Respondents and Defendants

DICKINSON , JOHN

DICKINSON , RACHEL

SEA GLASS GRILL LLC, A FLORIDA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

LAZAR , JASON M

 

Court Documents

PAID $300.00 ON RECEIPT 4721744

12/23/2022:PAID $300.00 ON RECEIPT 4721744

PAID $300.00 ON RECEIPT 4721744

12/23/2022:PAID $300.00 ON RECEIPT 4721744

COPY

12/22/2022:COPY

PAID $100.00 ON RECEIPT 4720237

12/22/2022:PAID $100.00 ON RECEIPT 4720237

TRUE COPY

12/20/2022:TRUE COPY

TRUE COPY

12/20/2022:TRUE COPY

ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF NEW CASE

12/20/2022:ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF NEW CASE

AUTOMATIC RECEIPT APPELLATE FILING

12/20/2022:AUTOMATIC RECEIPT APPELLATE FILING

APPEALS - REQUEST FOR FILING FEE

12/20/2022:APPEALS - REQUEST FOR FILING FEE

FINAL JUDGMENT BOOK 34016 PAGE 272-272

12/12/2022:FINAL JUDGMENT BOOK 34016 PAGE 272-272

MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT

12/07/2022:MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT

AFFIDAVIT OF INDEBTEDNESS

12/07/2022:AFFIDAVIT OF INDEBTEDNESS

AFFIDAVIT OF ATTORNEY FEES

12/07/2022:AFFIDAVIT OF ATTORNEY FEES

AFFIDAVIT AS TO COSTS

12/07/2022:AFFIDAVIT AS TO COSTS

RETURNED MAIL

12/02/2022:RETURNED MAIL

COMPLAINT FOR EVICT & DAMAGES

08/22/2022:COMPLAINT FOR EVICT & DAMAGES

NOTICE OF FILING

11/17/2022:NOTICE OF FILING

RECEIPT OF TRANSFER CASE TO CIRCUIT COURT

11/17/2022:RECEIPT OF TRANSFER CASE TO CIRCUIT COURT

34 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/23/2022
  • FinancialReceipt Number: 4721744; Receipt Amount: $300.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2022
  • FinancialTotals:; total Amount Due: $801.00; total Amount Paid: $501.00; total-Amount Balance: $300.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2022
  • FinancialDue Date: 12/23/2022; Description: CA Circuit Civil Service Charges PB 01262020; Amount Due: $300.00; Amount Paid: $0.00; Amount Balance: $300.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2022
  • DocketDISBURSEMENT REQUEST; Notes: 4721744 $300.00 John Dickinson

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2022
  • DocketREVISED RECEIPT 4721744; Notes: 4721744

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $300.00 ON RECEIPT 4721744; Notes: $300.00 4721744 Fully Paid

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2022
  • DocketREVISED RECEIPT 4721744; Notes: 4721744

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $300.00 ON RECEIPT 4721744; Notes: $300.00 4721744 Fully Paid

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2022
  • FinancialReceipt Number: 4720237; Receipt Amount: $100.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOPY; Notes: OF THE NOTICE OF APPEAL FILED ELECTRONICALLY ON 12/16/22 F/B PLTS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
42 More Docket Entries
  • 08/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MAILING; Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes: RETURN OF SERVICE POSTED SEA GLASS GRILL LLC - 08/23/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $440.00 ON RECEIPT 4584874; Notes: $440.00 4584874 Fully Paid

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: jlazar@investmentslimited.com;lmorales@investmentslimited.com;bhaderspock@investmentslimited.com

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: jlazar@investmentslimited.com;lmorales@investmentslimited.com;bhaderspock@investmentslimited.com

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: jlazar@investmentslimited.com;lmorales@investmentslimited.com;bhaderspock@investmentslimited.com

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: jlazar@investmentslimited.com;lmorales@investmentslimited.com;bhaderspock@investmentslimited.com

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2022
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes: RD: South Branch County Civil Division - RD (Civil)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Investment LLC, 21st Avenue is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LAZAR , JASON M