This case was last updated from Palm Beach County 15th Judicial Circuit Courts on 05/04/2023 at 23:13:39 (UTC).

US DATA MINING GROUP INC V NASON YEAGER GERSON HARRIS AND FUMERO PA

Case Summary

On 09/24/2021 US DATA MINING GROUP INC filed a Contract - Professional Negligence lawsuit against NASON YEAGER GERSON HARRIS AND FUMERO PA. This case was filed in Palm Beach County 15th Judicial Circuit Courts, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BELL , CAROLYN. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    09/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Professional Negligence

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BELL , CAROLYN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

US DATA MINING GROUP INC

Defendants and Respondents

BERNSTEIN , BRIAN S

NASON YEAGER GERSON HARRIS AND FUMERO PA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

BUSCH , RICHARD S

SILVER ESQ, DAVID C

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

CONSTANTINE , LIZZA C

GOLDSTEIN , JEREMY

VINE , JONATHAN

 

Court Documents

STIPULATION

04/27/2023:STIPULATION

NOTICE OF CANCELLATION

04/03/2023:NOTICE OF CANCELLATION

CERTIFICATE

03/31/2023:CERTIFICATE

CERTIFICATE

03/31/2023:CERTIFICATE

NOTICE PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO PROPOUND ADDITIONAL INTERROGATORIES

03/30/2023:NOTICE PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO PROPOUND ADDITIONAL INTERROGATORIES

ORDER BELL DTD 3/24/23: PLT MOTION TO COMPEL GRANTED ** SEE ORDER **

03/24/2023:ORDER BELL DTD 3/24/23: PLT MOTION TO COMPEL GRANTED ** SEE ORDER **

REPLY/RESPONSE

03/15/2023:REPLY/RESPONSE

RESPONSE TO: IN OPPOSITION TO PLT'S MOTION TO COMPEL (F/B DFTS)

03/14/2023:RESPONSE TO: IN OPPOSITION TO PLT'S MOTION TO COMPEL (F/B DFTS)

NOTICE OF HEARING

03/07/2023:NOTICE OF HEARING

OBJECTION

02/28/2023:OBJECTION

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

02/27/2023:REQUEST TO PRODUCE

MOTION DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR LEAVE TO

02/27/2023:MOTION DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR LEAVE TO

NOTICE OF INTENT

02/22/2023:NOTICE OF INTENT

ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

02/17/2023:ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF DFTS MOTION TO DISMISS PLT'S FOURT AMENDED COMPLAINT (F/B DFTS)

02/17/2023:NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF DFTS MOTION TO DISMISS PLT'S FOURT AMENDED COMPLAINT (F/B DFTS)

NOTICE OF HEARING

01/24/2023:NOTICE OF HEARING

NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY

01/24/2023:NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY

MOTION TO DISMISS

01/23/2023:MOTION TO DISMISS

79 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

04/27/2023

DocketDISPOSED AFTER OTHER; Notes: DAO - DISPOSED AFTER OTHER

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/27/2023
View Court Documents

DocketSTIPULATION; Notes: JOINT FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE F/B PLT AND DFTS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/03/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE OF CANCELLATION; Notes: NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING 04/04/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/31/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCERTIFICATE; Notes: PLAINTIFF'S CERTIFICATE OF AUTHORITY FOR MEDIATION

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/31/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCERTIFICATE; Notes: OF AUTHORITY FOR MEDIATION

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/30/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO PROPOUND ADDITIONAL INTERROGATORIES; Notes: PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO PROPOUND ADDITIONAL INTERROGATORIES

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/24/2023
View Court Documents

DocketORDER BELL DTD 3/24/23: PLT MOTION TO COMPEL GRANTED ** SEE ORDER **; Notes: BELL DTD 3/24/23: PLT MOTION TO COMPEL GRANTED ** SEE ORDER **

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/15/2023
View Court Documents

DocketREPLY/RESPONSE; Notes: IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION TO COMPEL F/B PLT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/14/2023
View Court Documents

DocketRESPONSE TO: IN OPPOSITION TO PLT'S MOTION TO COMPEL (F/B DFTS); Notes: IN OPPOSITION TO PLT'S MOTION TO COMPEL (F/B DFTS)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/07/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE OF HEARING; Notes: DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF HEARING 04/04/2023 08:30:00 AM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
80 More Docket Entries
09/28/2021

FinancialReceipt Number: 4191425; Receipt Amount: $421.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/28/2021

FinancialDue Date: 09/28/2021; Description: e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/28/2021

FinancialDue Date: 09/28/2021; Description: e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/28/2021

FinancialDue Date: 09/28/2021; Description: 800FF - Circuit Civil General PB; Amount Due: $401.00; Amount Paid: $401.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/28/2021
View Court Documents

DocketPAID $421.00 ON RECEIPT 4191425; Notes: $421.00 4191425 Fully Paid

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/28/2021

DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes: AF: Circuit Civil Central - AF (Civil)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/24/2021
View Court Documents

Docket~~CORRECT AND RESUBMIT SUMMONS NOT ISSUED PLEASE ATTACH ONLY THE 2 PAGES STANDING ORDER FOR CIRCUIT COURT SUMMONS CANT BE ISSUED DUE TO NOT COMPLYING WITH AO 3.107: CASE MANAGEMENT STANDING ORDER MUST BE ATTACHED TO THE SUMMONS PER AO 3.107. GO TO WWW.15THCIRCUIT.COM/CIVIL-DIFFERENTIATED-FORMS-AND-ORDERS TO DOWNLOAD A COPY.; Notes: DSilver@SilverMillerLaw.com;JMiller@SilverMillerLaw.com PLEASE ATTACH ONLY THE 2 PAGES STANDING ORDER FOR CIRCUIT COURT SUMMONS CANT BE ISSUED DUE TO NOT COMPLYING WITH AO 3.107: CASE MANAGEMENT STANDING ORDER MUST BE ATTACHED TO THE SUMMONS PER AO 3.107. GO TO WWW.15THCIRCUIT.COM/CIVIL-DIFFERENTIATED-FORMS-AND-ORDERS TO DOWNLOAD A COPY.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/24/2021
View Court Documents

Docket~~CORRECT AND RESUBMIT SUMMONS NOT ISSUED PLEASE ATTACH ONLY THE 2 PAGES STANDING ORDER FOR CIRCUIT COURT SUMMONS CANT BE ISSUED DUE TO NOT COMPLYING WITH AO 3.107: CASE MANAGEMENT STANDING ORDER MUST BE ATTACHED TO THE SUMMONS PER AO 3.107. GO TO WWW.15THCIRCUIT.COM/CIVIL-DIFFERENTIATED-FORMS-AND-ORDERS TO DOWNLOAD A COPY.; Notes: DSilver@SilverMillerLaw.com;JMiller@SilverMillerLaw.com PLEASE ATTACH ONLY THE 2 PAGES STANDING ORDER FOR CIRCUIT COURT SUMMONS CANT BE ISSUED DUE TO NOT COMPLYING WITH AO 3.107: CASE MANAGEMENT STANDING ORDER MUST BE ATTACHED TO THE SUMMONS PER AO 3.107. GO TO WWW.15THCIRCUIT.COM/CIVIL-DIFFERENTIATED-FORMS-AND-ORDERS TO DOWNLOAD A COPY.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/24/2021
View Court Documents

DocketCOMPLAINT; Notes: F/B PLT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/24/2021
View Court Documents

DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Notes

[+] Read More [-] Read Less