This case was last updated from Palm Beach County Courts on 02/03/2021 at 01:21:16 (UTC).

US BANK TRUST NATIONAL ASSOCIATION AS TRUSTEE OF CVI LCF MORTGAGE LOAN TRUST I V MERNICK, KENNETH R

Case Summary

On 02/18/2020 US BANK TRUST NATIONAL ASSOCIATION AS TRUSTEE OF CVI LCF MORTGAGE LOAN TRUST I filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against MERNICK, KENNETH R. This case was filed in Palm Beach County Courts, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is KERNER , SCOTT. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    02/18/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

KERNER , SCOTT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

US BANK TRUST NATIONAL ASSOCIATION AS TRUSTEE OF CVI LCF MORTGAGE LOAN TRUST I

Respondents and Defendants

MERNICK , LINDA S

UNKNOWN TENANT #2

MERNICK , KENNETH R

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF KENNETH R MERNICK

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF LINDA S MERNICK

WHITEHALL CONDOMINIUMS OF THE VILLAGES OF PALM BEACH LAKES ASSOCIATION INC

UNKNOWN TENANT #1

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

ROSENFELD , TARA L

Respondent and Defendant Attorney

PICCIN , RAYMOND A

 

Court Documents

PAID $19.10 ON RECEIPT 3824056

12/14/2020:PAID $19.10 ON RECEIPT 3824056

PAID $23.10 ON RECEIPT 3824056

11/25/2020:PAID $23.10 ON RECEIPT 3824056

RELEASE/CANCEL LIS PENDENS BOOK 31959 PAGE 1162-1163

11/23/2020:RELEASE/CANCEL LIS PENDENS BOOK 31959 PAGE 1162-1163

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

07/23/2020:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY

07/23/2020:NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY

SERVICE RETURN- NOT SERVED

07/23/2020:SERVICE RETURN- NOT SERVED

SERVICE RETURN- NOT SERVED

07/23/2020:SERVICE RETURN- NOT SERVED

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

07/23/2020:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

06/24/2020:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

06/24/2020:ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

PAID $990.60 ON RECEIPT 3546456

02/20/2020:PAID $990.60 ON RECEIPT 3546456

SUMMONS ISSUED

02/18/2020:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

02/18/2020:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

02/18/2020:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

02/18/2020:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

02/18/2020:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

02/18/2020:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

02/18/2020:SUMMONS ISSUED

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/14/2020
  • FinancialReceipt Number:3824056; Receipt Amount: $23.10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $19.10 ON RECEIPT 3824056; Notes:$19.10 3824056 Balance Due: $4.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • DocketREVISED RECEIPT 3824056; Notes:3824056

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • FinancialTotals: total Amount Due:$1,009.70; total Amount Paid:$1,009.70; total-Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • FinancialDue Date:11/25/2020; Description:VDAL Voluntary Dismissal Legal Description; Amount Due:$0.60; Amount Paid:$0.60; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • FinancialDue Date:11/25/2020; Description:VD2P Volun Diss Each Additional Page $8.50; Amount Due:$8.50; Amount Paid:$8.50; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • FinancialDue Date:11/25/2020; Description:VD1P Volun Diss 1st Page $10.00; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $23.10 ON RECEIPT 3824056; Notes:$23.10 3824056 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • DocketDISPOSED BEFORE OTHER; Notes:DBO - DISPOSED BEFORE OTHER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRELEASE/CANCEL LIS PENDENS BOOK 31959 PAGE 1162-1163; Notes:NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE AND DISCHARGE OF LIS PENDENS FILED BY PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
22 More Docket Entries
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes:trosenfeld@ghidottiberger.com;fcpleadings@ghidottiberger.com;ycobas@ghidottiberger.com ISSUED TO UNKNOWN TENANT #2 EFILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes:trosenfeld@ghidottiberger.com;fcpleadings@ghidottiberger.com;ycobas@ghidottiberger.com ISSUED TO UNKNOWN TENANT #1 EFILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes:trosenfeld@ghidottiberger.com;fcpleadings@ghidottiberger.com;ycobas@ghidottiberger.com ISSUED TO UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF LINDA S MERNICK EFILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes:trosenfeld@ghidottiberger.com;fcpleadings@ghidottiberger.com;ycobas@ghidottiberger.com ISSUED TO UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF KENNETH R MERNICK EFILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes:trosenfeld@ghidottiberger.com;fcpleadings@ghidottiberger.com;ycobas@ghidottiberger.com ISSUED TO LINDA S MERNICK EFILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes:trosenfeld@ghidottiberger.com;fcpleadings@ghidottiberger.com;ycobas@ghidottiberger.com ISSUED TO KENNETH R MERNICK EFILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE; Notes:OF PHYSICAL POSSESSION OF ORIGINAL PROMISSORY NOTE F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Notes:(VERIFIED) F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLIS PENDENS BOOK 31242 PAGE 896-897; Notes:F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WHITEHALL CONDOMINIUMS OF THE VILLAGES OF PALM BEACH LAKES ASSOCIATION INC is a litigant

Latest cases where U.S. Bank Trust, N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Raymond A Piccin