This case was last updated from Florida Palm Beach Court System on 08/10/2021 at 19:50:40 (UTC).

US BANK TRUST NATIONAL ASSOCIATION AS TRUSTEE FOR GIFM HOLDINGS TRUST V ZONTINI, ROBERT SHERIF

Case Summary

On 07/06/2021 US BANK TRUST NATIONAL ASSOCIATION AS TRUSTEE FOR GIFM HOLDINGS TRUST filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against ZONTINI, ROBERT SHERIF. This case was filed in Florida Palm Beach Court System, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is HAFELE , DONALD W. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    07/06/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Courthouse:

    Main Branch

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

HAFELE , DONALD W

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

US BANK TRUST NATIONAL ASSOCIATION AS TRUSTEE FOR GIFM HOLDINGS TRUST

Defendants and Respondents

UNKNOWN TENANT(S) IN POSSESSION

ZONTINI , ROBERT SHERIF

ZONTINI , TAMARA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

SANCHEZ , ALEXANDRA J

 

Court Documents

SERVICE RETURN- NOT SERVED

08/03/2021:SERVICE RETURN- NOT SERVED

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

08/03/2021:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

08/03/2021:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

NOTICE OF FILING

07/08/2021:NOTICE OF FILING

NOTICE OF FILING

07/06/2021:NOTICE OF FILING

NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT/REPORT

07/14/2021:NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT/REPORT

PAID $1,941.60 ON RECEIPT 4095259

07/08/2021:PAID $1,941.60 ON RECEIPT 4095259

COMPLAINT

07/06/2021:COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ISSUED

07/06/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

07/06/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

07/06/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED

NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT/REPORT

07/06/2021:NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT/REPORT

COPY

07/06/2021:COPY

CERTIFICATE

07/06/2021:CERTIFICATE

DIRECTIONS TO CLERK

07/06/2021:DIRECTIONS TO CLERK

LIS PENDENS

07/06/2021:LIS PENDENS

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

07/06/2021:STATEMENT OF CLAIM

CIVIL COVER SHEET

07/06/2021:CIVIL COVER SHEET

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURN- NOT SERVED; Notes:RETURN OF SERVICE UNKNOWN TENANT(S) IN POSSESSION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes:RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED TAMARA ZONTINI - 08/02/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes:RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED ROBERT SHERIF ZONTINI - 08/02/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT/REPORT; Notes:NON-MILITARYAFFIDWIT FLORIDA BAR NO. 154423 ROBERT SHERIF ZONTINI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • FinancialReceipt Number:4095259; Receipt Amount: $1,941.60

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • FinancialTotals: total Amount Due:$1,941.60; total Amount Paid:$1,941.60; total-Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • FinancialDue Date:07/08/2021; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • FinancialDue Date:07/08/2021; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • FinancialDue Date:07/08/2021; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • FinancialDue Date:07/08/2021; Description:Lis Pendens 1st Page $5.60; Amount Due:$5.60; Amount Paid:$5.60; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes:mail@hellerzion.com;efile@hellerzion.com AS TO ROBERT SHERIF ZONTINI EFILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT/REPORT; Notes:F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOPY; Notes:DUPLICATE SUMMONS NOT ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION; Notes:F/B ATTY SANCHEZ OBO PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE; Notes:CERTIFICATION OF SETTLEMENT AUTHORITY F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDIRECTIONS TO CLERK; Notes:FORM "A" F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING; Notes:CERTIFICATION OF SETTLEMENT AUTHORITY F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLIS PENDENS BOOK 32676 PAGE 724-724; Notes:F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Notes:VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where U.S. Bank Trust, N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SANCHEZ ALEXANDRA J