This case was last updated from Palm Beach County 15th Judicial Circuit Courts on 07/23/2019 at 12:57:30 (UTC).

US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION V MORGAN-MUSKIN, SHERI

Case Summary

On 10/21/2016 US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against MORGAN-MUSKIN, SHERI. This case was filed in Palm Beach County 15th Judicial Circuit Courts, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is FERRARA , JAMES. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    10/21/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

FERRARA , JAMES

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION

Defendants and Respondents

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF GARY MORGAN-MUSKIN

PLATINA COMMUNITY MASTER ASSOCIATION INC

UNKNOWN PARTIES IN POSSESSION #1

MORGAN-MUSKIN , GARY

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF SHERI MORGAN-MUSKIN

NEW YORK COMMUNITY BANK

MORGAN-MUSKIN , SHERI

UNKNOWN PARTIES IN POSSESSION #2

ILLUSTRE VILLAGE CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION INC

UNKNOWN PARTIES CLAIMING BY THOUGH UNDER AND AGAINST

11 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

DISKIN , LARA

Respondent and Defendant Attorneys

EDWARDS , SHEREE

KRAVIT , CORY B

CRIPPS , STEVEN

 

Court Documents

DOR FORECLOSURE FORM

08/11/2017:DOR FORECLOSURE FORM

FORECLOSURE CERTIFICATE OF DISBURSEMENT - SALE 2017-07-26

08/11/2017:FORECLOSURE CERTIFICATE OF DISBURSEMENT - SALE 2017-07-26

CERTIFICATE OF TITLE

08/11/2017:CERTIFICATE OF TITLE

PAID $665.70 ON RECEIPT 2279527

07/31/2017:PAID $665.70 ON RECEIPT 2279527

PAID $60.00 ON RECEIPT 2279508

07/31/2017:PAID $60.00 ON RECEIPT 2279508

FORECLOSURE CERTIFICATE OF SALE

07/26/2017:FORECLOSURE CERTIFICATE OF SALE

FORECLOSURE PROCESS SALE

07/26/2017:FORECLOSURE PROCESS SALE

PAID $70.00 ON RECEIPT 2264498

07/19/2017:PAID $70.00 ON RECEIPT 2264498

PROOF OF PUBLICATION

07/17/2017:PROOF OF PUBLICATION

NOTICE OF SALE, SALE DATE 07/26/2017

06/28/2017:NOTICE OF SALE, SALE DATE 07/26/2017

FINAL DISPOSITION SHEET

06/21/2017:FINAL DISPOSITION SHEET

FINAL JUDGMENT FORECLOSURE, , AMOUNT OF FJ $133,331.25, SALE DATE 07/26/2017, SIGNED DATE 06/21/2017 - JUDGE COLTON BOOK 29174 PAGE 542-547

06/21/2017:FINAL JUDGMENT FORECLOSURE, , AMOUNT OF FJ $133,331.25, SALE DATE 07/26/2017, SIGNED DATE 06/21/2017 - JUDGE COLTON BOOK 29174 PAGE 542-547

NOTICE OF HEARING

05/19/2017:NOTICE OF HEARING

CLERK'S DEFAULT

05/18/2017:CLERK'S DEFAULT

MOTION FOR DEFAULT

05/11/2017:MOTION FOR DEFAULT

MOTION FOR DEFAULT

05/11/2017:MOTION FOR DEFAULT

NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY

05/05/2017:NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY

MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

05/05/2017:MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

59 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDOR FORECLOSURE FORM; Notes:AMENDED FORECLOSURE FORM F/B PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFORECLOSURE CERTIFICATE OF DISBURSEMENT - SALE 2017-07-26; Notes:SFGBOCASERVICE@LOGS.COM 155427930

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF TITLE; Notes:ISSUED TO U.S BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, AS TRUSTEE FOR AMERICAN GENERAL MORTGAGE LOAN TRUST 2010-1 AMERICAN GENERAL MORTGAGE PASS-THROUGH CERTIFICATES, SERIES 2010-1 29287/1959

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $665.70 ON RECEIPT 2279527; Notes:$665.70 2279527 Fully Paid

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/31/2017
  • DocketFORECLOSURE FEES ADDED - SALE 2017-07-26; Notes:155427930

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $60.00 ON RECEIPT 2279508; Notes:$60.00 2279508 Balance Due: $665.70

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFORECLOSURE CERTIFICATE OF SALE; Notes:SOLD TO US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, AS TRUSTEE FOR AMERICAN GENERAL MORTGAGE LOAN TRUST 2010-1 AMERICAN GENERAL MORTGAGE PASS-THROUGH CERTIFICATES, SERIES 2010-1 FOR $95,100.00 SFGBOCASERVICE@LOGS.COM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFORECLOSURE PROCESS SALE; Notes:1 95100.00 134256.90 BID AND INFORMATION SHEET ATTACHED SALE 2017-07-26

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2017
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING; Notes:ATTORNEYS AFFIDAVIT OF POST JUDGMENT ADVANCES FILED BY US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $70.00 ON RECEIPT 2264498; Notes:$70.00 2264498 Fully Paid

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
79 More Docket Entries
  • 10/25/2016
  • DocketDue Date:10/25/2016; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2016
  • DocketDue Date:10/25/2016; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2016
  • DocketDue Date:10/25/2016; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2016
  • DocketDue Date:10/25/2016; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2016
  • DocketDue Date:10/25/2016; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2016
  • DocketDue Date:10/25/2016; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2016
  • DocketDue Date:10/25/2016; Description:Lis Pendens 2nd Page or additional pages $4.00; Amount Due:$4.00; Amount Paid:$4.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2016
  • DocketDue Date:10/25/2016; Description:Lis Pendens 1st Page $5.60; Amount Due:$5.60; Amount Paid:$5.60; Amount Balance:$0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2016
  • DocketDue Date:10/25/2016; Description:8XDT Additional DFT over 5 $2.50; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2016
  • DocketDue Date:10/25/2016; Description:800F2 CircCivil Real Prop $50,001 < $250,000 PB; Amount Due:$906.00; Amount Paid:$906.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less