Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Palm Beach Court System on 04/17/2021 at 11:05:09 (UTC).

US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION V GREEN, CYNTHIA

Case Summary

On 09/19/2012 US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against GREEN, CYNTHIA. This case was filed in Florida Palm Beach Court System, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are KERNER , SCOTT and MARX , JOSEPH. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    09/19/2012

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Florida Palm Beach Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Main Branch

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

KERNER , SCOTT

MARX , JOSEPH

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION

Defendants and Respondents

GREEN, CYNTHIA

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF CYNTHIA GREEN

GREEN, GARY M

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF GARY M GREEN

HAMMOCK RESERVE HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC

TENANT #1

TENANT #2

TENANT #3

TENANT #4

GREEN , GARY M

GREEN , CYNTHIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

HEGGESTAD ESQ, LAUREN M

STOCKER , MICHELLE L

GODFREY , PAUL

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

GROGAN , BRENNAN

WIDELL ESQ, RICHARD R

ERSKINE , CARLA E

 

Court Documents

SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY

03/08/2019:SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY

MOTION TO RESET CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND TO VACATE ANY ORDER ISSUED AS A RESULT OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SHCHEDULED FOR JANUARY 9, 2019 F/B GARY M GREEN AND CYNTHIA GREEN

01/09/2019:MOTION TO RESET CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND TO VACATE ANY ORDER ISSUED AS A RESULT OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SHCHEDULED FOR JANUARY 9, 2019 F/B GARY M GREEN AND CYNTHIA GREEN

SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY

06/13/2018:SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY

NOTICE OF HEARING

06/07/2018:NOTICE OF HEARING

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ORDER ON MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS AMENDED COMPLAINT F/B PLT/PET

07/24/2017:NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ORDER ON MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS AMENDED COMPLAINT F/B PLT/PET

RESPONSE TO: TO DFT'S MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLT'S ANSWER COMPLAINT - F/B PLT

06/20/2017:RESPONSE TO: TO DFT'S MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLT'S ANSWER COMPLAINT - F/B PLT

ORDER SETTING HEARING

05/02/2017:ORDER SETTING HEARING

NOTICE OF HEARING

02/15/2017:NOTICE OF HEARING

NOTICE OF HEARING

12/13/2016:NOTICE OF HEARING

NOTICE OF PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION F\B PLT, US BANK

03/25/2016:NOTICE OF PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION F\B PLT, US BANK

RESPONSE TO:

02/26/2016:RESPONSE TO:

NOTICE OF HEARING

06/03/2014:NOTICE OF HEARING

MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE

01/09/2014:MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

10/16/2012:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

10/16/2012:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

CIVIL COVER SHEET

09/19/2012:CIVIL COVER SHEET

LIS PENDENS BOOK 025481 PAGE 00437

09/19/2012:LIS PENDENS BOOK 025481 PAGE 00437

COMPLAINT

09/19/2012:COMPLAINT

127 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING; Notes:NOTICE OF HEARING 04/15/2021 08:30:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME; Notes:WITH RESPECT TO THE OBLIGATIONS CREATED BY MARCH 26, 2021 ORDER F/B DFT/COUNTER-PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION VERIFIED MOTION PURSUANT TO RULE 1.540 TO VACATE ORDER DATED MARCH 26, 2021 OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE VERIFIED MOTION PURSUANT TO RULE 1.540 FOR REHEARING/RECONSIDERATION OF ORDER DATED MARCH 26, 2021; Notes:VERIFIED MOTION PURSUANT TO RULE 1.540 TO VACATE ORDER DATED MARCH 26, 2021 OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE VERIFIED MOTION PURSUANT TO RULE 1.540 FOR REHEARING/RECONSIDERATION OF ORDER DATED MARCH 26, 2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER MARX; ON STATUS CHECK ON PLTF'S SHOWING OF GOOD CAUSE FOR WHY THIS ACTION SHOULD REMAIN OPEN; DFTS SHALL EMAIL PLTF THEIR SIGNED COUNTERPART TO THE SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT AND RELEASE WITHIN 10 DAYS OF THE DATE OF THIS ORDER (SEE ORDER FOR MORE DETAILS) DTD 3/26/2021; Notes:MARX; ON STATUS CHECK ON PLTF'S SHOWING OF GOOD CAUSE FOR WHY THIS ACTION SHOULD REMAIN OPEN; DFTS SHALL EMAIL PLTF THEIR SIGNED COUNTERPART TO THE SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT AND RELEASE WITHIN 10 DAYS OF THE DATE OF THIS ORDER (SEE ORDER FOR MORE DETAILS) DTD 3/26/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER SETTING HEARING; Notes:JMARX DTD 03/10/2021 VIA ZOOM. MARCH 23, 2021 @ 8:30 AM. STATUS CHECK. *****VIEW ORDER FOR ZOOM INSTRUCTIONS*****

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGOOD CAUSE MOT,NOT,JUD-DISMISS; Notes:FILED BY PLT UP 1-13-21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER SKERNER DTD 12/18/2020 DIRECTING PARTIES TO FILE APPLICABLE DISMISSAL PAPERS WITHIN 30 DAYS FROM THE DATE OF THIS ORDER.; Notes:SKERNER DTD 12/18/2020 DIRECTING PARTIES TO FILE APPLICABLE DISMISSAL PAPERS WITHIN 30 DAYS FROM THE DATE OF THIS ORDER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION; Notes:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE F/B ATTY GROGAN OBO DFT HAMMOCK RESERVE HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER KERNER; ON CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; PARTIES REPORT A SETTLEMENT IS BEING FINALIZED; NO FURTER CASE MANAGMENT CONFERENCES WILL BE SET AT THIS TIME DTD 5/26/2020; Notes:KERNER; ON CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; PARTIES REPORT A SETTLEMENT IS BEING FINALIZED; NO FURTER CASE MANAGMENT CONFERENCES WILL BE SET AT THIS TIME DTD 5/26/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING; Notes:NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC CONFERENCE HEARING (CONFERENCE CALL NUMBER (720) 835-5244 & CONFERENCE PIN NUMBER 09061) 05/19/2020 08:30:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
135 More Docket Entries
  • 09/19/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes:SM-12-113794 Filed by DEFENDANT CYNTHIA GREEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE; Notes:FORM A Filed by PLAINTIFF US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Notes:FORECLOSURE Filed by PLAINTIFF US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Notes:Filed by PLAINTIFF US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLIS PENDENS BOOK 025481 PAGE 00437; Notes:Filed by PLAINTIFF US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Notes:Filed by PLAINTIFF US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2012
  • DocketFEE/LIS PENDENS ($5.60); Notes:Filed by PLAINTIFF US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2012
  • DocketCAFF => $250K; Notes:Filed by PLAINTIFF US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2012
  • DocketPENDING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2012
  • DocketADDITIONAL COMMENTS

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HAMMOCK RESERVE HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC is a litigant

Latest cases where U.S. Bank, N.A. as Trustee for the RMAC Trust, Series 2016-CTT is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WIDELL ESQ, RICHARD R

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ERSKINE , CARLA E