Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Palm Beach Court System on 07/30/2019 at 15:42:13 (UTC).

US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION V BONGARD, CHARLES

Case Summary

On 09/26/2012 US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against BONGARD, CHARLES. This case was filed in Florida Palm Beach Court System, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    09/26/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Florida Palm Beach Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Main Branch

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION

Defendants and Respondents

BONGARD, CHARLES

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF CHARLES BONGARD

HEALY, SHERRY

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF SHERRY HEALY

VILLAGE OF PALM SPRINGS FLORIDA

TENANT #1

TENANT #2

TENANT #3

TENANT #4

BANK OF AMERICA NA

BONGARD , CHARLES

HEALY , SHERRY

9 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

LEWIS , LISA M

PIDALA , ANDREA D

GARNO , KIMBERLY L

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

GODDEAU ESQ, CHRISTY L

MINAYA , RADOYKA JINET

ALDEGUER , JESSICA M

DREILINGER ESQ, GREGG R

SLOWIK ESQ, MATTHEW

 

Court Documents

ORDER GRANTING

11/03/2014:ORDER GRANTING

ORDER

09/22/2014:ORDER

MOTION

06/23/2014:MOTION

BID SHEET

06/04/2014:BID SHEET

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

03/22/2014:CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

MEMORANDUM OF LAW

03/05/2014:MEMORANDUM OF LAW

STIP SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL

03/03/2014:STIP SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL

MOTION FOR DEFAULT

09/27/2013:MOTION FOR DEFAULT

NOTICE OF DEFAULT NOT ENTERED

03/26/2013:NOTICE OF DEFAULT NOT ENTERED

NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY

02/12/2013:NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY

NOTICE OF ACTION - PUBLICATION

12/07/2012:NOTICE OF ACTION - PUBLICATION

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

12/04/2012:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

12/04/2012:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

ANSWER

10/30/2012:ANSWER

SUMMONS ISSUED

09/26/2012:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

09/26/2012:SUMMONS ISSUED

CIVIL COVER SHEET

09/26/2012:CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

09/26/2012:COMPLAINT

62 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/03/2014
  • RECEIPT FOR PAYMENT; Notes:A Payment of -$15.00 was made on receipt CAMB954303.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2014
  • CHECK PRINTED; Notes:A Disbursment of $15.00 on Check Number 60559 to SHARON R BOCK CLERK & COMPTROLLER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2014
  • CHECK PRINTED; Notes:A Disbursment of $18,667.66 on Check Number 60555 to DISB BANK OF AMERICA NA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2014
  • ADDITIONAL COMMENTS; Notes:11/14/14 REQUESTED $15.00 CLERK FEE 11/14/14 REQUESTED $18,667.66 BANK OF AMERICA C/O MARINOSCI LAW GROUP Associated to docket ORDG filed on 2014-11-03

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER GRANTING; Notes:MOTION FOR SURPLUS FUNDS HELD IN COURT REGISTRY: GRANTED: ** SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS **: E BREGER DTD 11/3/14

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2014
  • REDISPOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2014
  • REOPEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER; Notes:TO SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL GRANTED ** SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS ** R OFTEDAL DTD 10/27/14

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2014
  • REDISPOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION; Notes:EX-PARTE MOTION TO SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL FOR DFT BANK OF AMERICA NA. SUBSTITUTE IN ATTY SLOWIK, EFILED BY ATTY SLOWIK Filed By ATTORNEY MATTHEW SLOWIK

    Read MoreRead Less
123 More Docket Entries
  • 06/24/2014
  • Due Date:06/24/2014; Description:Civil Conversion Fee PB; Amount Due:$50.00; Amount Paid:$50.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2014
  • Due Date:06/09/2014; Description:Civil Conversion Registry Fee; Amount Due:$796.50; Amount Paid:$796.50; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2014
  • Due Date:06/09/2014; Description:Civil Doc Stamps PB; Amount Due:$368.20; Amount Paid:$368.20; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2014
  • Due Date:06/09/2014; Description:Civil Foreclosure Online Sale Fee; Amount Due:$60.00; Amount Paid:$60.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2014
  • Due Date:06/09/2014; Description:Conversion Registry Posted PB; Amount Due:$2,630.00; Amount Paid:$2,630.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2014
  • Due Date:06/04/2014; Description:Conversion Registry Posted PB; Amount Due:$51,194.70; Amount Paid:$51,194.70; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2014
  • Due Date:06/03/2014; Description:Civil Conversion Fee PB; Amount Due:$70.00; Amount Paid:$70.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2012
  • Due Date:09/28/2012; Description:Civil Conversion Fee PB; Amount Due:$105.00; Amount Paid:$105.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2012
  • Due Date:09/28/2012; Description:Civil Conversion Fee PB; Amount Due:$5.60; Amount Paid:$5.60; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2012
  • Due Date:09/28/2012; Description:Civil Conversion Fee PB; Amount Due:$401.00; Amount Paid:$401.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where VILLAGE OF PALM SPRINGS is a litigant

Latest cases where Bank of America is a litigant

Latest cases where U.S. Bank, N.A. as Trustee for the RMAC Trust, Series 2016-CTT is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MINAYA, RADOYKA J. ESQ