This case was last updated from Palm Beach County Courts on 10/02/2022 at 19:11:52 (UTC).

UPTOWN 22 LP V JOHNSON, DWAYNE

Case Summary

On 08/23/2022 UPTOWN 22 LP filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against JOHNSON, DWAYNE. This case was filed in Palm Beach County Courts, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is GARRISON , EDWARD A. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    08/23/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

GARRISON , EDWARD A

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

UPTOWN 22 LP

Defendant and Respondent

JOHNSON , DWAYNE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

MCCAIN , RYAN R

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

08/23/2022:CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT FOR TENANT EVICTION

08/23/2022:COMPLAINT FOR TENANT EVICTION

SUMMONS ISSUED

08/23/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

PAID $195.00 ON RECEIPT 4586833

08/24/2022:PAID $195.00 ON RECEIPT 4586833

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

08/26/2022:CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

08/31/2022:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

09/02/2022:VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/02/2022
  • DocketDISMISSED BEFORE HEARING; Notes: DB - DISMISSED BEFORE HEARING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Notes: F/B PLT.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes: VERIFIED RETURN OF SERVICE POSTED DWAYNE JOHNSON - 08/29/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MAILING; Notes: DWAYNE JOHNSON

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2022
  • FinancialReceipt Number: 4586833; Receipt Amount: $195.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2022
  • FinancialTotals:; total Amount Due: $195.00; total Amount Paid: $195.00; total-Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2022
  • FinancialDue Date: 08/24/2022; Description: e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2022
  • FinancialDue Date: 08/24/2022; Description: 401FF County Civil Tenant Eviction; Amount Due: $185.00; Amount Paid: $185.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $195.00 ON RECEIPT 4586833; Notes: $195.00 4586833 Fully Paid

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2022
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes: RL: County Civil Central - RL (Civil)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: service@barfieldpa.com;rmccain@barfieldpa.com;dbarfield@barfieldpa.com

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR TENANT EVICTION; Notes: F/B PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Notes: F/B PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where UPTOWN is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer RYAN MCCAIN