This case was last updated from Florida Palm Beach Court System on 10/30/2021 at 15:15:13 (UTC).

UNIVERSAL PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY AS SUBROGEE OF JARED NAMM AND MARY ALLEN V ACTION ROOFING SERVICES, INC

Case Summary

On 09/24/2021 UNIVERSAL PROPERTY CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY AS SUBROGEE OF JARED NAMM AND MARY ALLEN filed an Other lawsuit against ACTION ROOFING SERVICES, INC. This case was filed in Florida Palm Beach Court System, North County Courthouse located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is STEPHENS , DEBRA MOSES. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-NB

  • Filing Date:

    09/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

STEPHENS , DEBRA MOSES

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

UNIVERSAL PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY AS SUBROGEE OF JARED NAMM AND MARY ALLEN

Defendants and Respondents

ACTION ROOFING SERVICES INC

ACTION ROOFING SERVICES, INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

MANNO , BRYAN

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

09/24/2021:CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

09/24/2021:COMPLAINT

~~CORRECT AND RESUBMIT SUMMONS NOT ISSUED SHARON R BOCK IS NO LONGER THE CLERK OF COURT THE NEW CLERK IS JOSEPH ABRUZZO

09/24/2021:~~CORRECT AND RESUBMIT SUMMONS NOT ISSUED SHARON R BOCK IS NO LONGER THE CLERK OF COURT THE NEW CLERK IS JOSEPH ABRUZZO

DIFFERENTIATED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN STANDING ORDER

09/24/2021:DIFFERENTIATED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN STANDING ORDER

PAID $310.00 ON RECEIPT 4189165

09/27/2021:PAID $310.00 ON RECEIPT 4189165

SUMMONS ISSUED

09/30/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED

DIFFERENTIATED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN STANDING ORDER

10/04/2021:DIFFERENTIATED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN STANDING ORDER

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/25/2021
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes:RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED ACTION ROOFING SERVICES INC - 10/25/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDIFFERENTIATED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN STANDING ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes:pleadings2@andreupalma.com;dandreu@andreupalma.com;MIAMIMAIL@andreupalma.com E ISSUED TO ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • FinancialReceipt Number:4189165; Receipt Amount: $310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • FinancialTotals: total Amount Due:$310.00; total Amount Paid:$310.00; total-Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • FinancialDue Date:09/27/2021; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • FinancialDue Date:09/27/2021; Description:400FF County Civil Claim >$2500<= $15000; Amount Due:$300.00; Amount Paid:$300.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $310.00 ON RECEIPT 4189165; Notes:$310.00 4189165 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes:RH: North Branch Cty Civ, SC, Evictions - RH (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDIFFERENTIATED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN STANDING ORDER; Notes:F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket~~CORRECT AND RESUBMIT SUMMONS NOT ISSUED SHARON R BOCK IS NO LONGER THE CLERK OF COURT THE NEW CLERK IS JOSEPH ABRUZZO; Notes:pleadings2@andreupalma.com;dandreu@andreupalma.com;MIAMIMAIL@andreupalma.com SHARON R BOCK IS NO LONGER THE CLERK OF COURT THE NEW CLERK IS JOSEPH ABRUZZO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Notes:F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Notes:F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Action Roofing Services Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where Universal Property & Casualty Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Manno, Bryan