This case was last updated from Palm Beach County 15th Judicial Circuit Courts on 03/11/2023 at 19:01:09 (UTC).

UNIVERSAL PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, AS SUBROGEE OF BETTIE AND JOHN R. CUMMING V FERRI, VINCENT

Case Summary

On 01/30/2023 UNIVERSAL PROPERTY CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, AS SUBROGEE OF BETTIE AND JOHN R CUMMING filed an Other lawsuit against FERRI, VINCENT. This case was filed in Palm Beach County 15th Judicial Circuit Courts, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CASTOR , FRANK S. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    01/30/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CASTOR , FRANK S

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

UNIVERSAL PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, AS SUBROGEE OF BETTIE AND JOHN R. CUMMING

Defendants and Respondents

FERRI , VINCENT

ALICIA M. FERRI, INC. D/B/A GULFVIEW CONSTRUCTION & PLUMBING

S&D CONTRACTING CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

RODRIGUEZ , DIANA E

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

01/30/2023:CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

01/30/2023:COMPLAINT

PAID $300.00 ON RECEIPT 4762266

01/31/2023:PAID $300.00 ON RECEIPT 4762266

SUMMONS ISSUED

02/03/2023:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

02/03/2023:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

02/03/2023:SUMMONS ISSUED

PAID $30.00 ON RECEIPT 4767973

02/06/2023:PAID $30.00 ON RECEIPT 4767973

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

02/16/2023:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

02/28/2023:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

02/28/2023:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes: VERIFIED RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED ALICIA M. FERRI, INC - 02/11/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes: VERIFIED RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED VINCENT FERRI - 02/11/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes: VERIFIED RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED SAD CONTRACTING CORPORATION RA SPIEGEL & UTRERA PA - 02/10/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2023
  • FinancialReceipt Number: 4767973; Receipt Amount: $30.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2023
  • FinancialTotals:; total Amount Due: $330.00; total Amount Paid: $330.00; total-Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2023
  • FinancialDue Date: 02/06/2023; Description: e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2023
  • FinancialDue Date: 02/06/2023; Description: e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2023
  • FinancialDue Date: 02/06/2023; Description: e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $30.00 ON RECEIPT 4767973; Notes: $30.00 4767973 Fully Paid

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: SubrogationService@universalproperty.com;ah0801@universalproperty.com AS TO VINCENT FERRI E-ISSUED TO ATTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: SubrogationService@universalproperty.com;ah0801@universalproperty.com AS TO ALICIA M. FERRI INC DBA GULFVIEW CONSTRUCTION & PLUMBING E-ISSUED TO ATTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: SubrogationService@universalproperty.com;ah0801@universalproperty.com AS TO S&D CONTRACTING CORPORATION E-ISSUED TO ATTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • FinancialReceipt Number: 4762266; Receipt Amount: $300.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • FinancialDue Date: 01/31/2023; Description: 400FF County Civil Claim >$2500<= $15000; Amount Due: $300.00; Amount Paid: $300.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $300.00 ON RECEIPT 4762266; Notes: $300.00 4762266 Fully Paid

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes: RB: County Civil Central - RB (Civil)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Notes: F/B PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Notes: F/B PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less