This case was last updated from Palm Beach County Courts on 09/24/2022 at 11:01:16 (UTC).

UNITED HEALTHCARE SERVICES INC V DUNOFF, ALYSSA

Case Summary

On 06/30/2022 UNITED HEALTHCARE SERVICES INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against DUNOFF, ALYSSA. This case was filed in Palm Beach County Courts, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is GILLMAN , PAIGE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    06/30/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

GILLMAN , PAIGE

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

OPTUMINSIGHT INC

UNITED BEHAVIORAL HEALTH INC

UNITED HEALTHCARE SERVICES INC

UNITEDHEALTH GROUP INC

Respondent and Defendant

DUNOFF , ALYSSA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

LANDAU , PHILIP J

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

06/30/2022:CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

06/30/2022:COMPLAINT

~~CORRECT AND RESUBMIT SUMMONS NOT ISSUED CASE MANAGEMENT STANDING ORDER MUST BE ATTACHED TO THE SUMMONS PER AO 3.107. GO TO WWW.15THCIRCUIT.COM/CIVIL-DIFFERENTIATED-FORMS-AND-ORDERS TO DOWNLOAD A COPY.

06/30/2022:~~CORRECT AND RESUBMIT SUMMONS NOT ISSUED CASE MANAGEMENT STANDING ORDER MUST BE ATTACHED TO THE SUMMONS PER AO 3.107. GO TO WWW.15THCIRCUIT.COM/CIVIL-DIFFERENTIATED-FORMS-AND-ORDERS TO DOWNLOAD A COPY.

PAID $411.00 ON RECEIPT 4524035

07/05/2022:PAID $411.00 ON RECEIPT 4524035

NOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION

07/05/2022:NOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION

SUMMONS ISSUED

07/07/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

07/15/2022:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes: RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED ALYSSA DUNOFF - 07/13/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: phil@landau.law;diane@landau.law AS TO DFT ALYSSA DUNOFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • FinancialReceipt Number: 4524035; Receipt Amount: $411.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • FinancialTotals:; total Amount Due: $411.00; total Amount Paid: $411.00; total-Amount Balance: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • FinancialDue Date: 07/05/2022; Description: e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • FinancialDue Date: 07/05/2022; Description: 800FF - Circuit Civil General PB; Amount Due: $401.00; Amount Paid: $401.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION; Notes: F/B ATTY PHILIP J. LANDAU, ESQ. OBO PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $411.00 ON RECEIPT 4524035; Notes: $411.00 4524035 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes: AK: Circuit Civil Central - AK (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket~~CORRECT AND RESUBMIT SUMMONS NOT ISSUED CASE MANAGEMENT STANDING ORDER MUST BE ATTACHED TO THE SUMMONS PER AO 3.107. GO TO WWW.15THCIRCUIT.COM/CIVIL-DIFFERENTIATED-FORMS-AND-ORDERS TO DOWNLOAD A COPY.; Notes: phil@landau.law;diane@landau.law CASE MANAGEMENT STANDING ORDER MUST BE ATTACHED TO THE SUMMONS PER AO 3.107. GO TO WWW.15THCIRCUIT.COM/CIVIL-DIFFERENTIATED-FORMS-AND-ORDERS TO DOWNLOAD A COPY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Notes: TO AVOID AND RECOVER FRAUDLENT TRANSFER F/B PLTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Notes

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Optuminsight, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where United Behavioral Health, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where UNITEDHEALTH GROUP INC. DBA OPTUM is a litigant

Latest cases where United Healthcare Corporation is a litigant