This case was last updated from Palm Beach County 15th Judicial Circuit Courts on 04/15/2023 at 01:03:45 (UTC).

UNIFUND CCR, LLC V DRUMMER, XAVIUS

Case Summary

On 03/01/2023 UNIFUND CCR, LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against DRUMMER, XAVIUS. This case was filed in Palm Beach County 15th Judicial Circuit Courts, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is SHULLMAN , SARAH L. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    03/01/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

SHULLMAN , SARAH L

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

UNIFUND CCR, LLC

Defendant and Respondent

DRUMMER , XAVIUS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

SINGER , JONATHAN R

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

03/01/2023:CIVIL COVER SHEET

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

03/01/2023:STATEMENT OF CLAIM

NOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION

03/01/2023:NOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION

PAID $185.00 ON RECEIPT 4799067

03/02/2023:PAID $185.00 ON RECEIPT 4799067

SUMMONS ISSUED

03/02/2023:SUMMONS ISSUED

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

03/20/2023:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

HEARING BY COURT PRETRIAL

04/13/2023:HEARING BY COURT PRETRIAL

ORDER OF DISMISSAL

04/13/2023:ORDER OF DISMISSAL

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/13/2023
  • HearingSCPTHA - Small Claims Pretrial Attorney; Location: MB; Room: 6M (Main Branch); Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER OF DISMISSAL; Notes: COURT ORDER FOR PAYMENT WITH FINAL JUDGMENT UPON DEFAULT, ORDER OF DISMISSAL, AND ORDER DIRECTING CLERK TO CLOSE FILE JUDGE SHULLMAN 4/13/23

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketHEARING BY COURT PRETRIAL; Notes: PLT ATTY PRESENT DFT PRESENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2023
  • DocketDISMISSED AFTER HEARING; Notes: DA - DISMISSED AFTER HEARING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes: VERIFIED RETURN OF SERVICE SUBSTITUTE XAVIUS DRUMMER - 03/09/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2023
  • FinancialReceipt Number: 4799067; Receipt Amount: $185.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2023
  • FinancialTotals:; total Amount Due: $185.00; total Amount Paid: $185.00; total-Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2023
  • FinancialDue Date: 03/02/2023; Description: e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2023
  • FinancialDue Date: 03/02/2023; Description: 406FF County Civil Claim >$500 < $2500; Amount Due: $175.00; Amount Paid: $175.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: JSINGER@OLLAWGROUP.COM E-ISSUED TO ATTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2023
  • DocketSET FOR SCPTHA - SMALL CLAIMS PRETRIAL ATTORNEY 4/13/2023 9:00 AM SHULLMAN, SARAH L; Notes: SCPTHA - Small Claims Pretrial Attorney 4/13/2023 9:00 AM SHULLMAN, SARAH L

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $185.00 ON RECEIPT 4799067; Notes: $185.00 4799067 Fully Paid

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2023
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes: RE: County Civil Central - RE (Civil)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION; Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less