This case was last updated from Palm Beach County Courts on 03/04/2022 at 03:29:25 (UTC).

ULYSSE, VIVIANE V DORLEUS, JOUBERT

Case Summary

On 01/24/2022 ULYSSE, VIVIANE filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against DORLEUS, JOUBERT. This case was filed in Palm Beach County Courts, South County Courthouse located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is SCHER , ROSEMARIE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-SB

  • Filing Date:

    01/24/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

SCHER , ROSEMARIE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

ULYSSE , VIVIANE

Defendant and Respondent

DORLEUS , JOUBERT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

HUPP , RAMONA MARIE

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

SINCKLER , NATASHIA A

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/09/2022
  • HearingDVHR - DVRV HEARING; Location:SB; Room:#3 (South Branch)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • DocketORDER OF DISMISSAL; Notes:OF TEMPORARY INJUNCTION FOR DOMESTIC VIOLENCE SIGNED BY R SCHER DATED 020922

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • DocketDISM/SETTLE/DISP AFTER HRG; Notes:DADR - DISMISSED/SETTLED DISPOSED AFTER HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • DocketATTY. FOR RESPONDENT: SINCKLER, NATASHIA A; Notes:ATTY. FOR RESPONDENT: SINCKLER, NATASHIA A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • DocketATTY. FOR PETITIONER: HUPP, RAMONA, MARIE; Notes:ATTY. FOR PETITIONER: HUPP, RAMONA, MARIE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • DocketEXHIBIT LIST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • DocketSET FOR DVHR - DVRV HEARING 2/9/2022 10:30 AM SCHER, ROSEMARIE; Notes:DVHR - DVRV HEARING 2/9/2022 10:30 AM SCHER, ROSEMARIE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • HearingDVHR - DVRV HEARING; Location:SB; Room:#3 (South Branch)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • DocketNOTICE F/B- RESP OF FILING HOME DEED; Notes:F/B- RESP OF FILING HOME DEED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL; Notes:AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS F/B R HUPP

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 01/24/2022
  • DocketORDER OF TEMP INJ/DOM VIOLENCE; Notes:HEARING SET FEB 2, 2022 AT 9AM RM 3, 200 W ATLANTIC AVE DELRAY BEACH FL 33444 SIGNED BY R SCHER DATED 012422***PBSO TO SERVE DOCKETS 3, 4, 8, 9 AND 10.***

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • DocketSHERIFF'S OFFICE INFO SHEET; Notes:DESCRIPTION SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • DocketPETITION FOR INJUNCTION; Notes:FOR DOMESTIC VIOLENCE F/B PET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • DocketSHERIFF'S OFFICE INFO SHEET; Notes:F/B PET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Notes:F/B PET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • DocketCIVIL DATE OF BIRTH; Notes:F/B PET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF RELATED CASE FORM; Notes:F/B PET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT UCC JURIS ACT; Notes:F/B PET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes:FZ: South Branch Family Division - FZ (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes:FX: South Branch Family Division - FX (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer HUPP , RAMONA MARIE