This case was last updated from Palm Beach County Courts on 02/04/2021 at 14:05:52 (UTC).

TRUST HILLS COMPANY LTD INC V GARCOA INC

Case Summary

On 03/16/2020 TRUST HILLS COMPANY LTD INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against GARCOA INC. This case was filed in Palm Beach County Courts, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is KERNER , SCOTT. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    03/16/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

KERNER , SCOTT

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff

TRUST HILLS COMPANY LTD INC

Respondent and Defendant

GARCOA INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff Attorney

SMITH ESQ, FRANK

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

03/16/2020:CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

03/16/2020:COMPLAINT

~~CORRECT AND RESUBMIT SUMMONS NOT ISSUED JURISDICTIONAL HEADING MUST BE COMPLETELY VISABLE

03/16/2020:~~CORRECT AND RESUBMIT SUMMONS NOT ISSUED JURISDICTIONAL HEADING MUST BE COMPLETELY VISABLE

PAID $411.00 ON RECEIPT 3585158

03/17/2020:PAID $411.00 ON RECEIPT 3585158

SUMMONS ISSUED

03/18/2020:SUMMONS ISSUED

NOTICE OF DISMISSAL FILED BY PLT

04/09/2020:NOTICE OF DISMISSAL FILED BY PLT

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/09/2020
  • DocketDISPOSED BEFORE OTHER; Notes:DBO - DISPOSED BEFORE OTHER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DISMISSAL FILED BY PLT; Notes:OF DISMISSAL FILED BY PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes:frank.smith@fmslawyer.com;ruth.smith@fmslawyer.com AS TO DFT GARCOA INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • FinancialReceipt Number:3585158; Receipt Amount: $411.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • FinancialTotals: total Amount Due:$411.00; total Amount Paid:$411.00; total-Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • FinancialDue Date:03/17/2020; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • FinancialDue Date:03/17/2020; Description:800FF - Circuit Civil General PB; Amount Due:$401.00; Amount Paid:$401.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $411.00 ON RECEIPT 3585158; Notes:$411.00 3585158 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes:AJ: Circuit Civil Central - AJ (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket~~CORRECT AND RESUBMIT SUMMONS NOT ISSUED JURISDICTIONAL HEADING MUST BE COMPLETELY VISABLE; Notes:frank.smith@fmslawyer.com;ruth.smith@fmslawyer.com JURISDICTIONAL HEADING MUST BE COMPLETELY VISABLE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Notes:F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GARCOA INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SMITH ESQ, FRANK