This case was last updated from Palm Beach County 15th Judicial Circuit Courts on 02/20/2023 at 22:45:36 (UTC).

TRUIST BANK V DARVILLE, ANTHONY N

Case Summary

On 01/11/2023 TRUIST BANK filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against DARVILLE, ANTHONY N. This case was filed in Palm Beach County 15th Judicial Circuit Courts, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CHEESMAN , MAXINE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    01/11/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CHEESMAN , MAXINE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

TRUIST BANK

Respondents and Defendants

DARVILLE , ANTHONY N

DARVILLE , STACY

DISCOVER BANK

RAINBERRY AT WEST BOCA PROPERTY OWNERS ASSOCIATION

RAINBERRY PARK HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASUR

UNKNOWN TENANT 1

UNKNOWN TENANT 2

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

HERNANDEZ , MARK

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

BROUGH , DAVID L

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT

01/11/2023:COMPLAINT

PAID $23.50 ON RECEIPT 4780864

02/16/2023:PAID $23.50 ON RECEIPT 4780864

FINAL DISPOSITION SHEET

02/15/2023:FINAL DISPOSITION SHEET

RELEASE/CANCEL LIS PENDENS BOOK 34128 PAGE 677-677

02/15/2023:RELEASE/CANCEL LIS PENDENS BOOK 34128 PAGE 677-677

SERVICE RETURN- NOT SERVED

01/26/2023:SERVICE RETURN- NOT SERVED

SERVICE RETURN- NOT SERVED

01/26/2023:SERVICE RETURN- NOT SERVED

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

01/26/2023:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

01/26/2023:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

ANSWER

01/24/2023:ANSWER

PAID $573.10 ON RECEIPT 4740315

01/12/2023:PAID $573.10 ON RECEIPT 4740315

SUMMONS ISSUED

01/11/2023:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

01/11/2023:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

01/11/2023:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

01/11/2023:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

01/11/2023:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

01/11/2023:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

01/11/2023:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

01/11/2023:SUMMONS ISSUED

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/16/2023
  • FinancialReceipt Number: 4780864; Receipt Amount: $23.50

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2023
  • FinancialTotals:; total Amount Due: $596.60; total Amount Paid: $596.60; total-Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2023
  • FinancialDue Date: 02/16/2023; Description: VD2P Volun Diss Each Additional Page $8.50; Amount Due: $8.50; Amount Paid: $8.50; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2023
  • FinancialDue Date: 02/16/2023; Description: VD1P Volun Diss 1st Page $10.00; Amount Due: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2023
  • FinancialDue Date: 02/16/2023; Description: Efile fee INDX $1 fee party after 4; Amount Due: $5.00; Amount Paid: $5.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $23.50 ON RECEIPT 4780864; Notes: $23.50 4780864 Fully Paid

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2023
  • DocketDISPOSED BEFORE OTHER; Notes: DBO - DISPOSED BEFORE OTHER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFINAL DISPOSITION SHEET; Notes: F/B PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRELEASE/CANCEL LIS PENDENS BOOK 34128 PAGE 677-677; Notes: WITHOUT PREJUDICE AND NOTICE OF DISCHARGE OF LIS PENDENS F/B PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURN- NOT SERVED; Notes: RETURN OF NON-SERVIOF UNKNOWN TENANT #2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
24 More Docket Entries
  • 01/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: abarksdale@awtspa.com;stb@awtspa.com;kbowman@awtspa.com ISSUED TO RAINBERRY PARK HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC EFILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: abarksdale@awtspa.com;stb@awtspa.com;kbowman@awtspa.com ISSUED TO RAINBERRY AT WEST BOCA PROPERTY OWNERS ASSOCIATION INC EFILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: abarksdale@awtspa.com;stb@awtspa.com;kbowman@awtspa.com ISSUED TO DISCOVER BANK EFILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: abarksdale@awtspa.com;stb@awtspa.com;kbowman@awtspa.com ISSUED TO STACEY DARVILLE FKA STACEY LAVACCA EFILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: abarksdale@awtspa.com;stb@awtspa.com;kbowman@awtspa.com ISSUED TO ANTHONY N DARVILLE EFILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDIFFERENTIATED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN STANDING ORDER; Notes: F/B PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Notes: VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY F/B PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLIS PENDENS BOOK 34067 PAGE 805-805; Notes: F/B PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Notes: VERIFIED F/B PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less